This case was last updated from PACER on 03/09/2021 at 10:13:39 (UTC).

Burton v. Department of the Navy

Case Summary

On 01/08/2021 Burton filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against Department of the Navy. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is D. P. Marshall Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00021

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

D. P. Marshall Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stacey L Burton

Defendant

Department of the Navy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James W. Stanley, Jr.

Attorney at The Stanley Law Firm P.A.

201 South Izard Street

Little Rock, AR 72201

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER granting #1 motion to proceed in forma pauperis; and directing Burton's lawyer to prepare a summons, which the Clerk will issue, for Secretary Braithwaite. Counsel must deliver process to the U.S. Marshal for the Eastern District of Arkansas. The Court directs the Marshal to serve the summons and complaint without prepayment of fees. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/13/2021. (ajt) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Department of the Navy filed by Stacey L Burton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Stacey L Burton. (ajt) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and returned to attorney for plaintiff as to Secretary, Department of the Navy, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jap) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER granting #1 motion to proceed in forma pauperis; and directing Burton's lawyer to prepare a summons, which the Clerk will issue, for Secretary Braithwaite. Counsel must deliver process to the U.S. Marshal for the Eastern District of Arkansas. The Court directs the Marshal to serve the summons and complaint without prepayment of fees. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/13/2021. (ajt) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Department of the Navy filed by Stacey L Burton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Stacey L Burton. (ajt) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James W. Stanley, Jr.