This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:16:07 (UTC).

Benjamin Burton et al v. Moreno Valley Police Department, et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Benjamin Burton filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Moreno Valley Police Department. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cormac J. Carney and Kenly Kiya Kato. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-02338

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cormac J. Carney

Referral Judge

Kenly Kiya Kato

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Benjamin Burton

Riverside, CA 92508

Jeanette Burton

Riverside, CA 92508

Sylvester Brooks

Riverside, CA 92508

Defendants

County of Riverside

Does 1-50

Unknown Moreno Valley Police Officers

Other Unknown Moreno Valley Police Department Employees

Moreno Valley Police Department

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Monrow Mabon

Attorney at Monrow Mabon Law Offices

19069 Van Buren Boulevard Suite 114-316

Riverside, CA 92508

Defendant Attorney

Allen Christiansen

Attorney at Ferguson Praet and Sherman APC

1631 East 18Th Street

Santa Ana, CA 92705

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Declaration

#9

(#9) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan (Unilateral Report of Defendant County of Riverside) ; estimated length of trial 3-4 days, filed by Defendant County of Riverside.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Christiansen, Allen) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF INTENT upon filing of the complaint by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on February 13, 2020. (gga) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant County of Riverside.(Christiansen, Allen) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#6

(#6) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant County of Riverside. (Christiansen, Allen) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Cormac J. Carney. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:19-cv-02338 CJC (KKx). (esa) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant County of Riverside, (Christiansen, Allen) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside, case number RIC1905574 Receipt No: 0973-24898692 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant County of Riverside. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Allen Christiansen added to party County of Riverside(pty:dft))(Christiansen, Allen) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan (Unilateral Report of Defendant County of Riverside) ; estimated length of trial 3-4 days, filed by Defendant County of Riverside.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Christiansen, Allen) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF INTENT upon filing of the complaint by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on February 13, 2020. (gga) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant County of Riverside.(Christiansen, Allen) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant County of Riverside. (Christiansen, Allen) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Cormac J. Carney. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:19-cv-02338 CJC (KKx). (esa) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants County of Riverside, Does, Moreno Valley Police Department, Other Unknown Moreno Valley Police Department Employees, Unknown Moreno Valley Police Officers, filed by plaintiffs Jeanette Burton, Benjamin Burton, Sylvester Brooks. (filed in state court 11/7/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant County of Riverside, (Christiansen, Allen) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside, case number RIC1905574 Receipt No: 0973-24898692 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant County of Riverside. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Allen Christiansen added to party County of Riverside(pty:dft))(Christiansen, Allen) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.