This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/20/2022 at 08:15:38 (UTC).

Burrow et al v. 3M Company et al

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 Burrow filed a Property - Real Property Product Liability lawsuit against 3M Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John G. Koeltl. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00465

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Real Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John G. Koeltl

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Eddie Burrow

Carl Frazier

Raymond Gilbert

Willie Goins

Henry Green

Stanley Huff

Byron Johnson

Mary Johnson

Robert Kelly

Marvin King

Paul Kuykendall

Ralph Maston

Cleveland McGuaire

Patricia Morgan

Mary Morris

Nicholas Pellegrino

Charles Powell

Brian Sanders

Alayne Smith

Robert Syphax

28 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Jordan David Sagalowsky

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP (NY)

1221 Avenue Of The Americas, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10020-1001

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co)..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#4

(#4) CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 1/31/2022) (sjo) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketReceived e-mail from the United States District Court - District of South Carolina acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 2:22-cv-00305, filed on 01/31/2022. (sjo) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketMDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (sjo) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 1/31/2022) (sjo) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co)..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: NOT INDICATED. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25602486).Document filed by 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint).(Sagalowsky, Jordan) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jordan David Sagalowsky