This case was last updated from PACER on 05/07/2021 at 10:12:12 (UTC).

Burris et al v. Wetzel et al

Case Summary

On 03/08/2021 Burris filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Wetzel. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Martin C. Carlson and Matthew W. Brann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00421

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Martin C. Carlson

Presiding Judge

Matthew W. Brann

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Perry Burris

Bellefonte, PA 16823

Shawn Strawn

Bellefonte, PA 16823

Edward Wright

Somerset, PA 15510

Alfonso Percy Pew

Bellefonte, PA 16823

Defendants

Lt. Vance

Heather Halderman

Sharon Clark

John Wetzel

Lt. Sherman

Dorina Varner

Phillips

Ms. Abbey Wasson

Nikki Paul

John and Jane Doe(s)

Mark Garman

Trisha Pilosi

Brian Makosy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Karen M. Romano

Attorney at Office of Attorney General

15Th Floor, Strawberry Square

Harrisburg, PA 17120

Jonathan M. Blake

Attorney at Office of Attorney General - Civil Litigation Division

15Th Floor

Harrisburg, PA 17120

Karen Mascio Romano

Attorney at Pennsylvania Office of Attorney General

15Th Floor

Harrisburg, PA 17101

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Shawn Strawn containing Doc 19, mail was refused. Inmate released, no forwarding address. (ibr) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

#29

(#29) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Shawn Strawn containing Doc 13 was refused. Spoke with SCI Rockview and Strawn was released June 2020. No updated address, unable to forward. (ibr) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

#28

(#28) Letter to Court from Alfonso Pew re case. (aaa) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#27

(#27) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Shawn Strawn containing Doc. 23 was refused. Mail was not resent. (ibr) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

#26

(#26) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Shawn Strawn containing Doc. 8 was refused. Mail not resent. (ibr) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#25

(#25) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Shawn Strawn containing Doc. 19 was refused. Mail resent. (ibr) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

24 #2

Brief in Support of Objections

24 #1

Exhibits

#19

(#24) OBJECTIONS by Alfonso Percy Pew to #19 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Briefs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Brief in Support of Objections)(lg) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

2 #4

399 Form

2 #3

398 Form

2 #2

Fed & Local Rules

2 #1

Instruction Sheet

#2

(#2) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED. (Attachments: #1 Instruction Sheet, #2 Fed & Local Rules, #3 398 Form, #4 399 Form) Letter and attachments forwarded to all plaintiffs, including Edward Wright who is currently incarcerated at SCI-Somerset. (lp) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by John Wetzel, Sharon Clark, Ms. Abbey Wasson, Heather Halderman, Dorina Varner, Lt. Sherman, Phillips, Lt. Vance, Nikki Paul, Mark Garman, John and Jane Doe(s), Brian Makosy, Trisha Pilosi from Court of Common Pleas of Cumberland County, case number 2019-04948. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAMDC-5505135), filed by John Wetzel, Sharon Clark, Ms. Abbey Wasson, Heather Halderman, Dorina Varner, Lt. Sherman, Phillips, Lt. Vance, Nikki Paul, Mark Garman, John and Jane Doe(s), Brian Makosy, Trisha Pilosi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(lp) Modified on 3/8/2021 (lp). Modified on 3/9/2021 (lp). (Entered: 03/08/2021)

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Shawn Strawn containing Doc 19, mail was refused. Inmate released, no forwarding address. (ibr) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Shawn Strawn containing Doc 13 was refused. Spoke with SCI Rockview and Strawn was released June 2020. No updated address, unable to forward. (ibr) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Letter to Court from Alfonso Pew re case. (aaa) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketVERBAL ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Case reassigned to Honorable Matthew W. Brann and referred to Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson as one or more parties have not consented to the jurisdiction of a U.S. Magistrate Judge. (jkc) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Shawn Strawn containing Doc. 23 was refused. Mail was not resent. (ibr) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Shawn Strawn containing Doc. 8 was refused. Mail not resent. (ibr) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Shawn Strawn containing Doc. 19 was refused. Mail resent. (ibr) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) OBJECTIONS by Alfonso Percy Pew to #19 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Briefs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Brief in Support of Objections)(lg) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER denying #21 request to appoint counsel, at this time without prejudice to re-examining this issue at the request of each individual plaintiff, or sua sponte, as this litigation progresses. Accordingly, each plaintiff is ORDERED that he must individually file any motions seeking appointment of counsel. In addition each plaintiff must also individually respond to this motion to dismiss on or before May 4, 2021. Pursuant to Local Rule 7.7 the movants may then file reply briefs on or before May 18, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on April 20, 2021. (kjn) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #21 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Appoint ad Litem filed by Alfonso Percy Pew. (lg) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #9 MOTION to Stay re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Alfonso Percy Pew.(ao) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Stay re #6 MOTION to Dismiss by Alfonso Percy Pew.(ao) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Perry Burris, Sharon Clark, John and Jane Doe(s), Mark Garman, Heather Halderman, Brian Makosy, Nikki Paul, Alfonso Percy Pew, Phillips, Trisha Pilosi, Lt. Sherman, Shawn Strawn, Lt. Vance, Dorina Varner, Ms. Abbey Wasson, John Wetzel, Edward Wright YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 4/26/2021. (kjn) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sharon Clark, Mark Garman, Heather Halderman, Brian Makosy, Nikki Paul, Phillips, Trisha Pilosi, Lt. Sherman, Lt. Vance, Dorina Varner, Ms. Abbey Wasson, John Wetzel.(Blake, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss by Sharon Clark, Mark Garman, Heather Halderman, Brian Makosy, Nikki Paul, Phillips, Trisha Pilosi, Lt. Sherman, Lt. Vance, Dorina Varner, Ms. Abbey Wasson, John Wetzel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Blake, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Ms. Abbey Wasson, Heather Halderman, Phillips, Trisha Pilosi, Sharon Clark, Dorina Varner, Lt. Sherman, Nikki Paul, Lt. Vance, Mark Garman, Brian Makosy, John Wetzel. Ms. Abbey Wasson waiver sent on 3/9/2021, answer due 5/10/2021; Heather Halderman waiver sent on 3/9/2021, answer due 5/10/2021; Phillips waiver sent on 3/9/2021, answer due 5/10/2021; Trisha Pilosi waiver sent on 3/9/2021, answer due 5/10/2021; Sharon Clark waiver sent on 3/9/2021, answer due 5/10/2021; Dorina Varner waiver sent on 3/9/2021, answer due 5/10/2021; Lt. Sherman waiver sent on 3/9/2021, answer due 5/10/2021; Nikki Paul waiver sent on 3/9/2021, answer due 5/10/2021; Lt. Vance waiver sent on 3/9/2021, answer due 5/10/2021; Mark Garman waiver sent on 3/9/2021, answer due 5/10/2021; Brian Makosy waiver sent on 3/9/2021, answer due 5/10/2021; John Wetzel waiver sent on 3/9/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Blake, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M. Blake on behalf of Sharon Clark, Mark Garman, Heather Halderman, Brian Makosy, Nikki Paul, Phillips, Trisha Pilosi, Lt. Sherman, Lt. Vance, Dorina Varner, Ms. Abbey Wasson, John Wetzel (Blake, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COUNTY COURT RECORD from Cumberland County Court of Common Pleas. (Attachments: #1 part two, #2 part three, #3 part four, #4 part five)(aaa) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED. (Attachments: #1 Instruction Sheet, #2 Fed & Local Rules, #3 398 Form, #4 399 Form) Letter and attachments forwarded to all plaintiffs, including Edward Wright who is currently incarcerated at SCI-Somerset. (lp) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by John Wetzel, Sharon Clark, Ms. Abbey Wasson, Heather Halderman, Dorina Varner, Lt. Sherman, Phillips, Lt. Vance, Nikki Paul, Mark Garman, John and Jane Doe(s), Brian Makosy, Trisha Pilosi from Court of Common Pleas of Cumberland County, case number 2019-04948. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAMDC-5505135), filed by John Wetzel, Sharon Clark, Ms. Abbey Wasson, Heather Halderman, Dorina Varner, Lt. Sherman, Phillips, Lt. Vance, Nikki Paul, Mark Garman, John and Jane Doe(s), Brian Makosy, Trisha Pilosi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(lp) Modified on 3/8/2021 (lp). Modified on 3/9/2021 (lp). (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where John and Jane Doe(s) 1-25 is a litigant

Latest cases where DR. PHILLIPS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan M. Blake Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Karen Mascio Romano