This case was last updated from PACER on 12/31/2019 at 08:41:17 (UTC).

Burriola v. State of Nevada et al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2019 Burriola filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against State of Nevada. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard F. Boulware, II and Nancy J. Koppe. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01936

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard F. Boulware, II

Referral Judge

Nancy J. Koppe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony Burriola

Indian Springs, NV 89070-0650

Defendants

State of Nevada

A. D. Ford

Dept of NV Parole and Probation Commissioners

Williams

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE to the Court re #3 Order, by Anthony Burriola. (MR) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#6

(#6) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Anthony Burriola. (MR) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#5

(#5) JUDGMENT in favor of Dept of NV Parole and Probation Commissioners, State of Nevada, Williams, A. D. Ford against Anthony Burriola. Re: #4 Order, Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 12/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/14/2019 - nef regenerated) (MMM). (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that this action is dismissed without prejudice based on Plaintiff's failure to file an application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the full filing fee in compliance with this Court's 11/5/2019, order. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court WILL SEND Plaintiff the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner. File a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis or payment of filing fees due 12/5/2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court will retain #1 -1 the complaint but will not file it at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Encl.: in forma pauperis by a prisoner w/ instructions - ADR) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

#2

(#2) ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (MR) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

1 #1

Complaint

#1

(#1) RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (MR) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE to the Court re #3 Order, by Anthony Burriola. (MR) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Anthony Burriola. (MR) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) JUDGMENT in favor of Dept of NV Parole and Probation Commissioners, State of Nevada, Williams, A. D. Ford against Anthony Burriola. Re: #4 Order, Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 12/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/14/2019 - nef regenerated) (MMM). (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that this action is dismissed without prejudice based on Plaintiff's failure to file an application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the full filing fee in compliance with this Court's 11/5/2019, order. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court WILL SEND Plaintiff the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner. File a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis or payment of filing fees due 12/5/2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court will retain #1 -1 the complaint but will not file it at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Encl.: in forma pauperis by a prisoner w/ instructions - ADR) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (MR) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (MR) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (RT) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less