This case was last updated from PACER on 11/10/2020 at 09:51:41 (UTC).

Burns v. Miranda

Case Summary

On 09/11/2020 Burns filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Miranda. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alaska District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joshua M. Kindred. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00227

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alaska District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joshua M. Kindred

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sultan Stephon Burns

Seward, AK 99664

Defendants

Alaska Department of Corrections

M. Miranda

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Mandee Suzanne Mlcek

Attorney at Attorney General's Office (Anch)

1031 W. 4Th Avenue, Suite 200

Anchorage, AK 99501

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER TO COLLECT FILING FEE Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 11/6/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND RESPONSE: Alaska Department of Corrections is terminated as a defendant. The Application to Waive Prepayment of the Filing Fee, at docket #3 , is GRANTED. The Motion for Entry of Default, at docket #7 , is DENIED AS PREMATURE. On or before 21 days the Attorney General for the State of Alaska shall file an appearance. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 11/6/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

7 #3

Proof of Services

7 #2

Affidavit

7 #1

Affidavit

#7

(#7) MOTION for Entry of Default by Sultan Stephon Burns. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Proof of Services)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#6

(#6) PROOF OF SERVICE for M. Miranda by Sultan Stephon Burns (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#5

(#5) PROOF OF SERVICE for Ak Dept. of Corrections by Sultan Stephon Burns. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#4

(#4) Unissued summons re Defendant M. Miranda. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

3 #1

Account Statement

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sultan Stephon Burns. (Attachments: #1 Account Statement)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

1 #13

12

1 #8

7

1 #4

3

1 #3

2

1 #1

Exhibit List

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Alaska Department of Corrections, M. Miranda, filed by Sultan Stephon Burns. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 1, #3 2, #4 3, #5 4, #6 5, #7 6, #8 7, #9 8, #10 9, #11 10, #12 11, #13 12)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER TO COLLECT FILING FEE Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 11/6/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND RESPONSE: Alaska Department of Corrections is terminated as a defendant. The Application to Waive Prepayment of the Filing Fee, at docket #3 , is GRANTED. The Motion for Entry of Default, at docket #7 , is DENIED AS PREMATURE. On or before 21 days the Attorney General for the State of Alaska shall file an appearance. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 11/6/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Entry of Default by Sultan Stephon Burns. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Proof of Services)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROOF OF SERVICE for M. Miranda by Sultan Stephon Burns (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROOF OF SERVICE for Ak Dept. of Corrections by Sultan Stephon Burns. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Unissued summons re Defendant M. Miranda. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sultan Stephon Burns. (Attachments: #1 Account Statement)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Alaska Department of Corrections, M. Miranda, filed by Sultan Stephon Burns. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 1, #3 2, #4 3, #5 4, #6 5, #7 6, #8 7, #9 8, #10 9, #11 10, #12 11, #13 12)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less