This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/11/2023 at 09:10:14 (UTC).

Burns v. Equifax Information Services, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/10/2023 Burns filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Equifax Information Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John R. Tunheim and Tony N. Leung. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:23-CV-00079

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John R. Tunheim

Referral Judge

Tony N. Leung

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kent Burns

Defendant

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David J S Madgett

Defendant Attorney

Jeremy Thompson

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Summons and Complaint

1 #2

Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Thompson, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

#3

(#3) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Extension of Time to Answer #2 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Thompson, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

#4

(#4) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for Equifax Information Services LLC. (Thompson, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC is given through and including January 31, 2023 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 1/12/2023. (HAM) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Thompson, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION for Kent Burns. (Madgett, David) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 3/16/2023 at 10:00 AM via Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 2/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (HAM) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

10 #1

Consent Form

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION for Kent Burns. (Madgett, David) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION for Kent Burns. (Madgett, David) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 3/16/2023 at 10:00 AM via Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 2/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (HAM) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION for Kent Burns. (Madgett, David) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Thompson, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC is given through and including January 31, 2023 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 1/12/2023. (HAM) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • Docket(#6) (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Amanda Sperow as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MMG) cc:Amanda Sperow. Modified text on 1/12/2023 (MMG). (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • Docket(#5) (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 23-cv-79 JRT/TNL.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MMG) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for Equifax Information Services LLC. (Thompson, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Extension of Time to Answer #2 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Thompson, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Thompson, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10001066) filed by Equifax Information Services LLC. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Thompson, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less