This case was last updated from PACER on 12/12/2020 at 08:07:21 (UTC).

Alan Burns v. Azusa Pacific University

Case Summary

On 10/13/2020 Alan Burns filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Azusa Pacific University. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Maria A. Audero and Christina A. Snyder. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-09401

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Maria A. Audero

Presiding Judge

Christina A. Snyder

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alan Burns

Defendants

Azusa Pacific University

DOES 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew P Malczynski

Attorney at Havens Malczyski Grigolla LLP

333 West Foothill Boulevard

Glendora, CA 91741

Defendant Attorneys

David M Lester

Attorney at Atkinson Andelson Loya Ruud and Romo APC

12800 Center Court Drive South Suite 300

Cerritos, CA 90703-9364

Mia Angelina Lomedico

Attorney at Atkinson Andelson Loya Ruud and Romo APC

12800 Center Court Drive South Suite 300

Cerritos, CA 90703-9364

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (shb) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#19

(#19) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO REMAND REMOVED ACTION AND FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS TO BE PAID VY DEFENDANT IN THE AMOUNT OF $6,625.00, #12 AND NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT AZUSA PACIFIC UNIVERSITY, #13 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court GRANTS the Motion to Remand and REMANDS this case to the Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles. The Court further DENIES plaintiff's motion for attorneys' fees. The Court further DENIES plaintiff's motion for attorneys' fees. In light of the Court's ruling herein, it DENIES the other pending motions as moot. Re Los Angeles Superior Court Case No. 20STCV33562. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (shb) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

13 #2

Proposed Order

13 #1

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Azusa Pacific University. Motion set for hearing on 12/21/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Defendant Azusa Pacific University, #2 Proposed Order) (Lester, David) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

12 #3

Proposed Order Proposed Order

12 #2

Memorandum Points & Authorities

12 #1

Declaration Decl. of M. Malczynski

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Stanley Mosk Courthouse filed by plaintiff Alan Burns. Motion set for hearing on 12/14/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Decl. of M. Malczynski, #2 Memorandum Points & Authorities, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Malczynski, Matthew) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

2 #4

Exhibit 4

2 #3

Exhibit 3

2 #2

Exhibit 2

2 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#11) MINUTE ORDER(IN CHAMBERS) DEFENDANT AZUSA PACIFIC UNIVERSITY'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTIONS 1332 AND 1441(a) #1 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Accordingly, defendant is hereby ORDERED to show cause on or before November 18, 2020, why the instant action should not be remanded to the Los Angeles County Superior Court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. See minute order for details. (lom) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (shb) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO REMAND REMOVED ACTION AND FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS TO BE PAID VY DEFENDANT IN THE AMOUNT OF $6,625.00, #12 AND NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT AZUSA PACIFIC UNIVERSITY, #13 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court GRANTS the Motion to Remand and REMANDS this case to the Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles. The Court further DENIES plaintiff's motion for attorneys' fees. The Court further DENIES plaintiff's motion for attorneys' fees. In light of the Court's ruling herein, it DENIES the other pending motions as moot. Re Los Angeles Superior Court Case No. 20STCV33562. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (shb) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) First Amended AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by plaintiff Alan Burns(Malczynski, Matthew) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SCHEDULING NOTICE (IN CHAMBERS) ADVANCEMENT AND SETTING HEARING BY TELEPHONE by Judge Christina A. Snyder re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #13 , previously noticed for 12/21/2020 at 8:30 AM has been rescheduled. Motion hearing is advanced from 12/21/20 to 12/14/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder, to be heard simultaneously with the NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Stanley Mosk Courthouse #12 . The hearing will be held by telephone. Bridge Call information will be emailed to counsel the week before. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Stanley Mosk Courthouse #12 filed by Defendant Azusa Pacific University. (Lester, David) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Azusa Pacific University. Re [Proposed] Order Re Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lester, David) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE filed by Defendant Azusa Pacific Universityto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines, #11 Response to Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not Be Remanded (Lester, David) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Azusa Pacific University. Motion set for hearing on 12/21/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Defendant Azusa Pacific University, #2 Proposed Order) (Lester, David) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Stanley Mosk Courthouse filed by plaintiff Alan Burns. Motion set for hearing on 12/14/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Decl. of M. Malczynski, #2 Memorandum Points & Authorities, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Malczynski, Matthew) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE ORDER(IN CHAMBERS) DEFENDANT AZUSA PACIFIC UNIVERSITY'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTIONS 1332 AND 1441(a) #1 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Accordingly, defendant is hereby ORDERED to show cause on or before November 18, 2020, why the instant action should not be remanded to the Los Angeles County Superior Court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. See minute order for details. (lom) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Azusa Pacific University answer now due 11/19/2020, filed by Defendant Azusa Pacific University.(Lester, David) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (jtil) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Alan Burns in Los Angeles Superior Court on 9/2/2020, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant Azusa Pacific University, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on October 13, 2020. (Lester, David) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Azusa Pacific University, (Lester, David) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Azusa Pacific University. (Lester, David) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DECLARATION of David M. Lester re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Azusa Pacific University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Lester, David) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior, case number 20stcv33562 Receipt No: ACACDC-28517208 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Azusa Pacific University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Attorney David M Lester added to party Azusa Pacific University(pty:dft))(Lester, David) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AZUSA PACIFIC UNIVERSITY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David M Lester