This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/04/2021 at 08:57:03 (UTC).

BURNS et al v. SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 BURNS filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-04373

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JONATHAN T BURNS

LAUREN M BURNS

Defendants

SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC.

NEWELL BRANDS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BETHANY R. NIKITENKO

Attorney at Feldman Shepherd Wohlgelernter Tanner Weinstock & Dodig, LLP

1845 Walnut Street21St Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

DANIEL J. MANN

Attorney at FELDMAN SHEPHERD, WOHLGELERNTER, TANNER & WEINSTOCK

1845 Walnut St.21St Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorneys

Brian Boyle

Attorney at Mintzer, Sarowitz, Zeris, Ledva & Meyers

1500 Market Streetsuite 4100

Philadelphia, PA 19102

JEFFREY C. SOTLAND

Attorney at MINTZER, SAROWITZ, ZERIS, LEDVA & MEYERS LLP

1500 Market Streetsuite 4100

Philadelphia, PA 19102

 

Court Documents

11 #2

Exhibit

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order

11 #11

Main Document

9 #4

Certificate of Service

9 #3

Exhibit A

9 #2

Text of Proposed Order

9 #1

Memorandum

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS, [ECF 3], IS DENIED, AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 10/15/21.10/15/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, ) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

#7

(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by JONATHAN T BURNS, LAUREN M BURNS.(MANN, DANIEL) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL J. MANN on behalf of JONATHAN T BURNS, LAUREN M BURNS (MANN, DANIEL) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

5 #1

Certificate of Service

5 #5

Main Document

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Newell Brands, Inc. is publicly traded on the NASDAQ Exchange under the symbol NWL. The following publicly-held corporations own ten percent (10%) or more of Newells stock: BlackRock Inc. NYSE: BLK) and various Icahn Group entities, including but not limited to Icahn Enterprises, L.P., which is traded on the NASDAQ Exchange under the symbol IEP. by NEWELL BRANDS, INC..(SOTLAND, JEFFREY) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

#3

(#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC..(SOTLAND, JEFFREY) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

2 #2

Text of Proposed Order

2 #1

Memorandum

2 #2

Main Document

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Memorandum of Law in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Strike #7 Amended Complaint filed by JONATHAN T BURNS, LAUREN M BURNS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(MANN, DANIEL) Modified on 11/2/2021 (tjd). (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • Docket(#10) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (sg, ) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Strike #7 Amended Complaint filed by NEWELL BRANDS, INC., SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Certificate of Service)(SOTLAND, JEFFREY) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS, [ECF 3], IS DENIED, AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 10/15/21.10/15/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, ) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by JONATHAN T BURNS, LAUREN M BURNS.(MANN, DANIEL) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL J. MANN on behalf of JONATHAN T BURNS, LAUREN M BURNS (MANN, DANIEL) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN D. BOYLE on behalf of NEWELL BRANDS, INC., SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC. with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BOYLE, BRIAN) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Newell Brands, Inc. is publicly traded on the NASDAQ Exchange under the symbol NWL. The following publicly-held corporations own ten percent (10%) or more of Newells stock: BlackRock Inc. NYSE: BLK) and various Icahn Group entities, including but not limited to Icahn Enterprises, L.P., which is traded on the NASDAQ Exchange under the symbol IEP. by NEWELL BRANDS, INC..(SOTLAND, JEFFREY) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC..(SOTLAND, JEFFREY) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(f) filed by NEWELL BRANDS, INC., SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC. Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(SOTLAND, JEFFREY) Modified on 10/12/2021 (tjd). (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee for COMPLAINT or NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NEWELL BRANDS, INC., SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC.. (Filing Fee $402, receipt number APAEDC-15463938). (SOTLAND, JEFFREY) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NEWELL BRANDS, INC., SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC. from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, case number 201100719., filed by NEWELL BRANDS, INC., SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B)(SOTLAND, JEFFREY) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sunbeam Products, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Newell Brands DTC, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JEFFREY C. SOTLAND