This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/07/2022 at 07:04:52 (UTC).

Burnham v. T-Mobile USA Inc

Case Summary

On 05/05/2022 Burnham filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against T-Mobile USA Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas S. Zilly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00613

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas S. Zilly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Burnham

Defendant

T-Mobile USA Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Erika L. Nusser

Attorney at TERRELL MARSHALL LAW GROUP PLLC

936 N 34Th St, Ste 300

Seattle, WA 98103-8869

Matthew S Parmet

Attorney at PARMET PC

3 Riverway Ste 1910

Houston, TX 77056

Toby James Marshall

Attorney at TERRELL MARSHALL LAW GROUP PLLC

936 N 34Th St, Ste 300

Seattle, WA 98103-8869

Lance Loyd

Attorney at LANCE LOYD ATTORNEY AT LAW

Po Box 77

Fox Island, WA 98333

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (AMD) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lance Loyd on behalf of Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Loyd, Lance) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

#4

(#4) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Matthew S. Parmet FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Michael Burnham (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7543561 (Loyd, Lance) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Matthew S Parmet on behalf of Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Parmet, Matthew) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Thomas S. Zilly: Joint Status Report due by 7/5/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 6/21/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/5/2022. (TKL) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Thomas S. Zilly: Joint Status Report due by 7/5/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 6/21/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/5/2022. (TKL) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Matthew S Parmet on behalf of Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Parmet, Matthew) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Matthew S Parmet for Plaintiff Michael Burnham by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Matthew S. Parmet FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Michael Burnham (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7543561 (Loyd, Lance) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lance Loyd on behalf of Plaintiff Michael Burnham. (Loyd, Lance) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (AMD) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketNOTICE TO FILER: ***Case Terminated-Incorrect Division*** Civil case number 3:22-cv-05317 has been terminated. The incorrect divisional office was selected by the filer upon case opening. This case has now been assigned a Seattle case number. All future filings shall bear the following case number and Judge assignment: 2:22-cv-00613-TSZ. Before initiating a new case, please review the #Attorney Case Opening Guide (PDF) to determine the correct divisional jurisdiction. (AMD) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Class and Collective Action Complaint against defendant(s) T-Mobile USA Inc (Receipt # AWAWDC-7541526) Attorney Erika L. Nusser added to party Michael Burnham(pty:pla), filed by Michael Burnham. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nusser, Erika) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where T-Mobile USA, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Scott Parmet

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Toby J. Marshall

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Erika L. Nusser