This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2019 at 10:36:20 (UTC).

Burnett v. Griffith

Case Summary

On 04/03/2019 Burnett filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Griffith. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Janet T. Neff and Ellen S. Carmody. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00257

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Janet T. Neff

Referral Judge

Ellen S. Carmody

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dillon Burnett

Defendant

Josh Griffith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William F. Piper

Attorney at William F. Piper PLC

1611 W Centre Ave., Ste. 209

Portage, MI 49024

Defendant Attorneys

Lisa A. Hall

Attorney at Plunkett Cooney (Grand Rapids)

333 Bridge St., Nw, Ste. 530

Grand Rapids, MI 49504

Michael S. Bogren

Attorney at Plunkett Cooney (Kalamazoo)

950 Trade Centre Way, Ste. 310

Kalamazoo, MI 49002

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) CORRECTED ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 8/8/2019 at 10:00 AM at 664 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody; status report due by 8/5/2019; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 8/8/2019 at 10:00 AM at 664 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; status report due by 8/5/2019; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Josh Griffith (Bogren, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Josh Griffith as to Josh Griffith waiver sent on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/29/2019 (Hall, Lisa) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Josh Griffith (jlg) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#7

(#7) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Piper, William) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER REGARDING SERVICE: the Clerk shall issue the proposed summons for service provided by Plaintiff's attorney; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, cbh) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

#5

(#5) (DISREGARD) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Josh Griffith (pjw) Modified text on 4/3/2019; entered in error; attorney notified (pjw). (Entered: 04/03/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff and Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (pjw) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

#3

(#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Piper, William) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

#2

(#2) DEMAND for TRIAL BY JURY by plaintiff Dillon Burnett (Piper, William) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Josh Griffith filed by Dillon Burnett (Piper, William) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CORRECTED ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 8/8/2019 at 10:00 AM at 664 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody; status report due by 8/5/2019; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 8/8/2019 at 10:00 AM at 664 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; status report due by 8/5/2019; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Josh Griffith (Bogren, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Josh Griffith as to Josh Griffith waiver sent on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/29/2019 (Hall, Lisa) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Lisa A. Hall on behalf of defendant Josh Griffith (Hall, Lisa) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Michael S. Bogren on behalf of defendant Josh Griffith (Bogren, Michael) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Josh Griffith (jlg) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Piper, William) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER REGARDING SERVICE: the Clerk shall issue the proposed summons for service provided by Plaintiff's attorney; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, cbh) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) (DISREGARD) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Josh Griffith (pjw) Modified text on 4/3/2019; entered in error; attorney notified (pjw). (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff and Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (pjw) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Dillon Burnett in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4404152 (Piper, William) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Piper, William) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DEMAND for TRIAL BY JURY by plaintiff Dillon Burnett (Piper, William) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Josh Griffith filed by Dillon Burnett (Piper, William) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.