This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/17/2019 at 07:13:46 (UTC).

Jeffrey Burmeister v. Equifax Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 Jeffrey Burmeister filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Equifax Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Douglas F. McCormick and David O. Carter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-01789

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Douglas F. McCormick

Presiding Judge

David O. Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeffrey Burmeister

Defendants

Equifax Inc.

Does 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Ottinger

Attorney at The Ottinger Firm PC

535 Mission Street 14Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Defendant Attorneys

Sophia S Kwan

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

400 Capitol Mall Suite 2350

Sacramento, CA 95814

Joshua A Rodine

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

2029 Century Park East Suite 3500

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3021

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) SCHEDULING ORDER & ORDER RE: PRETRIAL AND TRIAL PROCEDURES by Judge David O. Carter: Discovery cut-off 6/2/2020, Motion cut-off 8/3/2020 @ 8:30 AM, Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/14/2020 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter, Jury Trial set for 9/22/2020 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#16

(#16) ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge David O. Carter. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. (dgo) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#13

(#13) STATUS REPORT Joint Initial Status Conference Report Pursuant to Federal Rule 26(f) filed by Defendant Equifax Inc.. (Kwan, Sophia) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation Continuing FRCP 16(B) Status Conference #11 . Scheduling Conference continued to 11/18/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (twdb) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

11 #1

Proposed Order CONTINUING FRCP 16(B) STATUS CONFERENCE

#11

(#11) Joint STIPULATION for Hearing re FRCP 16(B) STATUS CONFERENCE filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey Burmeister. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order CONTINUING FRCP 16(B) STATUS CONFERENCE)(Ottinger, Robert) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#10

(#10) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey Burmeister.. (Ottinger, Robert) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 10/28/2019 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#8

(#8) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (lh) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Equifax Inc. (Kwan, Sophia) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Equifax Inc.. (Kwan, Sophia) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#2

(#2) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Equifax Inc., identifying Equifax, Inc.. (Kwan, Sophia) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

1 #3

Declaration of Mollie Prasad

1 #2

Answer to Complaint

1 #1

Civil Case Cover Sheet, Summons and Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange Superior, case number 30-2019-01090484-CU-WT-CJC Receipt No: 0973-24458556 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Equifax Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Cover Sheet, Summons and Complaint, #2 Answer to Complaint, #3 Declaration of Mollie Prasad) (Attorney Sophia S Kwan added to party Equifax Inc.(pty:dft))(Kwan, Sophia) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) SCHEDULING ORDER & ORDER RE: PRETRIAL AND TRIAL PROCEDURES by Judge David O. Carter: Discovery cut-off 6/2/2020, Motion cut-off 8/3/2020 @ 8:30 AM, Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/14/2020 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter, Jury Trial set for 9/22/2020 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge David O. Carter. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. (dgo) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • (#15) MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge David O. Carter: Scheduling Order to be issued. Court Reporter: CourtSmart; Courtroom Deputy: Deborah Lewman; Plaintiff Attorney: Robert Ottinger; Defendant Attorney: Joshua A. Rodine; Time in Court: :07. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (dgo) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • (#14) SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter: The Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 11/18/2019 @ 8:30 AM has been rescheduled. Scheduling Conference set for 11/12/2019 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) STATUS REPORT Joint Initial Status Conference Report Pursuant to Federal Rule 26(f) filed by Defendant Equifax Inc.. (Kwan, Sophia) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation Continuing FRCP 16(B) Status Conference #11 . Scheduling Conference continued to 11/18/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (twdb) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Joint STIPULATION for Hearing re FRCP 16(B) STATUS CONFERENCE filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey Burmeister. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order CONTINUING FRCP 16(B) STATUS CONFERENCE)(Ottinger, Robert) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey Burmeister.. (Ottinger, Robert) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 10/28/2019 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (lh) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Equifax Inc. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL)(lh) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-10, Equifax Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey Burmeister. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 8/15/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Equifax Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 served on 09/18/2019. (Kwan, Sophia) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Equifax Inc. (Kwan, Sophia) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Equifax Inc.. (Kwan, Sophia) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Equifax Inc., identifying Equifax, Inc.. (Kwan, Sophia) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange Superior, case number 30-2019-01090484-CU-WT-CJC Receipt No: 0973-24458556 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Equifax Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Cover Sheet, Summons and Complaint, #2 Answer to Complaint, #3 Declaration of Mollie Prasad) (Attorney Sophia S Kwan added to party Equifax Inc.(pty:dft))(Kwan, Sophia) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EQUIFAX INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert W. Ottinger