This case was last updated from PACER on 04/06/2019 at 08:09:46 (UTC).

Burley v. Sumner County 18th Judicial Drug Task Force

Case Summary

On 02/05/2019 Burley filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Sumner County 18th Judicial Drug Task Force. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are William L. Campbell, Jr and Jeffery S. Frensley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00118

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William L. Campbell, Jr

Referral Judge

Jeffery S. Frensley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ivan Antjuan Burley

Nashville, TN 37209

Defendants

Sumner County 18th Judicial Drug Task Force

Officer Jason Arnold

Sumner County

Judge Dee David Gay

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Summons Reissued as to Herbert H. Slatery III, Attorney General for the State of Tennessee. Forwarded to USM for service. (jw) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

#7

(#7) Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Attorney General of the State of Tennessee for not including the name of the Attorney General. (jw) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jason Arnold, Dee David Gay, Sumner County, Sumner County 18th Judicial Drug Task Force, filed by Ivan Antjuan Burley.(jw) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons issued as to Sumner County 18th Judicial Drug Task Force. Forwarded to USM for service. (jw) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER: Plaintiff Ivan Burley's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Doc. No. 2) is GRANTED, and the Clerk is DIRECTED to file the Complaint in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to ISSUE PROCESS to the defendant Drug Task Force, to the attention of Director Kelly Murphy, at the address provided by Plaintiff, and to ensure service upon Defendant, the Tennessee Attorney General, and Anthony Holt, Sumner County Executive, at 355 North Belvedere Drive, Room 102, Gallatin, TN 37066. This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 2/19/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jw) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#2

(#2) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Ivan Antjuan Burley. (jw) Modified on 2/19/2019 (jw). (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Sumner County 18th Judicial Drug Task Force filed by Ivan Antjuan Burley.(jw) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Reissued as to Herbert H. Slatery III, Attorney General for the State of Tennessee. Forwarded to USM for service. (jw) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Attorney General of the State of Tennessee for not including the name of the Attorney General. (jw) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jason Arnold, Dee David Gay, Sumner County, Sumner County 18th Judicial Drug Task Force, filed by Ivan Antjuan Burley.(jw) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons issued as to Sumner County 18th Judicial Drug Task Force. Forwarded to USM for service. (jw) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER: Plaintiff Ivan Burley's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Doc. No. 2) is GRANTED, and the Clerk is DIRECTED to file the Complaint in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to ISSUE PROCESS to the defendant Drug Task Force, to the attention of Director Kelly Murphy, at the address provided by Plaintiff, and to ensure service upon Defendant, the Tennessee Attorney General, and Anthony Holt, Sumner County Executive, at 355 North Belvedere Drive, Room 102, Gallatin, TN 37066. This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 2/19/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet and blank, pro se forms included). (jw) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jw) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Ivan Antjuan Burley. (jw) Modified on 2/19/2019 (jw). (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Sumner County 18th Judicial Drug Task Force filed by Ivan Antjuan Burley.(jw) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less