This case was last updated from PACER on 12/07/2020 at 10:00:25 (UTC).

Burleson v. Johnson

Case Summary

On 10/08/2020 Burleson filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Johnson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00326

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gary Burleson

Defendant

Bonnie Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Justin Aaron Smith

Attorney at Sloan Hatcher Perry Runge Robertson & Smith- Longview

P O Box 2909, 101 E Whaley

Longview, TX 75601-2909

Defendant Attorney

George Matteson

Attorney at Moore, Giles & Matteson, LLP

1206 Stateline Avenue

Texarkana, AR 71854

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER to Complaint by Bonnie Johnson.(Matteson, George) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gary Burleson. Bonnie Johnson served on 10/15/2020, answer due 11/5/2020., AFFIDAVIT of Service for Original Complaint served on Bonnie Johnson on 10/15/2020, filed by Gary Burleson. (Smith, Justin) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued as to Bonnie Johnson. (nkl, ) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Bonnie Johnson ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-8044712.), filed by Gary Burleson.(Smith, Justin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/8/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (nkl, ). (Entered: 10/08/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER to Complaint by Bonnie Johnson.(Matteson, George) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gary Burleson. Bonnie Johnson served on 10/15/2020, answer due 11/5/2020., AFFIDAVIT of Service for Original Complaint served on Bonnie Johnson on 10/15/2020, filed by Gary Burleson. (Smith, Justin) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued as to Bonnie Johnson. (nkl, ) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, ) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Bonnie Johnson ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-8044712.), filed by Gary Burleson.(Smith, Justin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/8/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (nkl, ). (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less