This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/07/2019 at 08:02:39 (UTC).

Burleigh v. Wallace et al

Case Summary

On 05/08/2019 Burleigh filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Wallace. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ron Clark and Zack Hawthorn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:19-CV-00076

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Ron Clark

Zack Hawthorn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lakisha Burleigh

Defendants

Alfred Wallace

Protected Cargo Transport LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey B Badders

Attorney at Badders Law Firm - Lufkin

1318 S John Redditt, Suite A

Lufkin, TX 75904

Defendant Attorney

Michael Shane O'Dell

Attorney at Naman Howell Smith

306 West 7Th Street, Suite 405

Forth Worth, TX 76102

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDER assigning case to Judge Hawthorn by consent of the parties for all further proceedings and entry of judgment. Signed by District Judge Ron Clark on 6/17/2019. (bjc, ) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#16

(#16) CONSENT to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge by Lakisha Burleigh, Protected Cargo Transport LLC, Alfred Wallace. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (bjc, ) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

15 #1

Exhibit Proposed Order

#15

(#15) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(O'Dell, Michael) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Lakisha Burleigh First Supplemental Disclosure of Plaintiff, Lakisha Burleigh (Badders, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#12

(#12) NOTICE by Protected Cargo Transport LLC, Alfred Wallace Initial Disclosures (O'Dell, Michael) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Lakisha Burleigh Plaintiff's Notice of Initial Disclosure (Badders, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26(f) attorney conference on or before Monday, May 28, 2019. The case is SET for a Rule 16 management conference on July 12, 2019, at 11:00am in the Courtroom 102, Ward R. Burke United States Courthouse, 104 North Third Street, Lufkin, Texas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 5/9/19. (ljw, ) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE by Protected Cargo Transport LLC, Alfred Wallace Notice to Court All Documents Served on All Parites Counsel (O'Dell, Michael) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

#8

(#8) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Protected Cargo Transport LLC, Alfred Wallace. (O'Dell, Michael) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE by Protected Cargo Transport LLC, Alfred Wallace Certificate of Interested Parties (O'Dell, Michael) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE by Protected Cargo Transport LLC, Alfred Wallace List of All Counsel of Record (O'Dell, Michael) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE by Protected Cargo Transport LLC, Alfred Wallace Brief in Support of Removal (O'Dell, Michael) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by Protected Cargo Transport LLC, Alfred Wallace Index of Matters Being Filed (O'Dell, Michael) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

#3

(#3) ORIGINAL ANSWER (Filed in State Court) to #2 Plaintiff's Original Petition (Filed in State Court) by Protected Cargo Transport LLC, Alfred Wallace.(ljw, ) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

#2

(#2) Plaintiff's Original Petition (Filed in State Court) against All Defendants, filed by Lakisha Burleigh.(ljw, ) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Protected Cargo Transport LLC, Alfred Wallace from 145th District Court, Nacogdoches County, Texas, case number C1934619. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7259654), filed by Protected Cargo Transport LLC, Alfred Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Dell, Michael) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER assigning case to Judge Hawthorn by consent of the parties for all further proceedings and entry of judgment. Signed by District Judge Ron Clark on 6/17/2019. (bjc, ) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) CONSENT to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge by Lakisha Burleigh, Protected Cargo Transport LLC, Alfred Wallace. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (bjc, ) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(O'Dell, Michael) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Lakisha Burleigh First Supplemental Disclosure of Plaintiff, Lakisha Burleigh (Badders, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE by Protected Cargo Transport LLC, Alfred Wallace Initial Disclosures (O'Dell, Michael) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Lakisha Burleigh Plaintiff's Notice of Initial Disclosure (Badders, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26(f) attorney conference on or before Monday, May 28, 2019. The case is SET for a Rule 16 management conference on July 12, 2019, at 11:00am in the Courtroom 102, Ward R. Burke United States Courthouse, 104 North Third Street, Lufkin, Texas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 5/9/19. (ljw, ) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE by Protected Cargo Transport LLC, Alfred Wallace Notice to Court All Documents Served on All Parites Counsel (O'Dell, Michael) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Protected Cargo Transport LLC, Alfred Wallace. (O'Dell, Michael) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE by Protected Cargo Transport LLC, Alfred Wallace Certificate of Interested Parties (O'Dell, Michael) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE by Protected Cargo Transport LLC, Alfred Wallace List of All Counsel of Record (O'Dell, Michael) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE by Protected Cargo Transport LLC, Alfred Wallace Brief in Support of Removal (O'Dell, Michael) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE by Protected Cargo Transport LLC, Alfred Wallace Index of Matters Being Filed (O'Dell, Michael) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (ljw, ) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Case assigned to District Judge Ron Clark. (ljw, ) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORIGINAL ANSWER (Filed in State Court) to #2 Plaintiff's Original Petition (Filed in State Court) by Protected Cargo Transport LLC, Alfred Wallace.(ljw, ) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Plaintiff's Original Petition (Filed in State Court) against All Defendants, filed by Lakisha Burleigh.(ljw, ) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Protected Cargo Transport LLC, Alfred Wallace from 145th District Court, Nacogdoches County, Texas, case number C1934619. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7259654), filed by Protected Cargo Transport LLC, Alfred Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Dell, Michael) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey B Badders