This case was last updated from PACER on 03/26/2021 at 10:04:56 (UTC).

BURKS v. PNC BANK, N.A.

Case Summary

On 01/25/2021 BURKS filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against PNC BANK, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is W. Scott Hardy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00102

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

W. Scott Hardy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEMETRIOUS BURKS

Defendant

PNC BANK, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christine T. Elzer

Attorney at Elzer Law Firm, LLC

100 First Avenue, Suite 1010

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Defendant Attorneys

Erica L. Yohe

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

233 South Wacker Drive, Suite 8000

Chicago, IL 60606

Esteban Shardonofsky

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

700 Milam Street, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77002

Nicole C. Chomiak

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Two Seaport Lane, Suite 300

Boston, MA 06033

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Disclosure Statement identifying PNC Bancorp., Inc., and The PNC Financial Services Group, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by PNC BANK, N.A.. (Chomiak, Nicole) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

#13

(#13) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by PNC BANK, N.A.. (Chomiak, Nicole) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Esteban Shardonofsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 2/22/21. (kas) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Nicole C. Chomiak to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 2/22/21. (kas) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

10 #3

Proposed Order

10 #2

Certificate of Good Standing

10 #1

Affidavit

#10

(#10) MOTION for attorney Esteban Shardonofsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6358948) by PNC BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Shardonofsky, Esteban) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

#9

(#9) Proposed Order re #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by PNC BANK, N.A.. (Chomiak, Nicole) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

8 #2

Certificate of Good Standing

8 #1

Affidavit

#8

(#8) MOTION for attorney Nicole C. Chomiak to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6354981) by PNC BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing (Chomiak, Nicole) Modified on 2/19/2021 to correct title of attachment (2). (nll). (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (dms) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Erica L. Yohe on behalf of PNC BANK, N.A.. (Yohe, Erica) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DEMETRIOUS BURKS. PNC BANK, N.A. waiver sent on 1/25/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. (Elzer, Christine) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against PNC BANK, N.A. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6274707), filed by DEMETRIOUS BURKS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Disclosure Statement identifying PNC Bancorp., Inc., and The PNC Financial Services Group, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by PNC BANK, N.A.. (Chomiak, Nicole) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #13 Answer to Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 3/30/2021. (sdp) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by PNC BANK, N.A.. (Chomiak, Nicole) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Esteban Shardonofsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 2/22/21. (kas) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Nicole C. Chomiak to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 2/22/21. (kas) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for attorney Esteban Shardonofsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6358948) by PNC BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Shardonofsky, Esteban) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Proposed Order re #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by PNC BANK, N.A.. (Chomiak, Nicole) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a proposed order by using the Proposed Order event and linking it to the document in question. This message is for informational purposes only. (sdp) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for attorney Nicole C. Chomiak to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6354981) by PNC BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing (Chomiak, Nicole) Modified on 2/19/2021 to correct title of attachment (2). (nll). (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this document. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (dms) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (dms) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Erica L. Yohe on behalf of PNC BANK, N.A.. (Yohe, Erica) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DEMETRIOUS BURKS. PNC BANK, N.A. waiver sent on 1/25/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. (Elzer, Christine) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this document. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (dms) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (dms) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against PNC BANK, N.A. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6274707), filed by DEMETRIOUS BURKS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PNC Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christine T. Elzer