This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/03/2021 at 07:07:50 (UTC).

Burkel v. Union County Board of County Commissioners

Case Summary

On 09/04/2021 Burkel filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Union County Board of County Commissioners. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Marcia Morales Howard and Joel B. Toomey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00888

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marcia Morales Howard

Referral Judge

Joel B. Toomey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PATRICIA BURKEL

Defendant

UNION COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W. Birk

Attorney at Matthew Birk, Esq., Law Office

309 Ne 1St St.

Gainesville, FL 32601

Defendant Attorneys

Gary R. Wheeler

Attorney at Constangy, Brooks, Smith, & Prophete, LLP

200 W Forsyth St - Ste 1700, Po Box 41099

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Jadie Rease Mims

Attorney at Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete, LLP

200 West Forsyth Street, Suite 1700

Jacksonville, FL 32202

John F. Dickinson

Attorney at Constangy, Brooks, Smith, & Prophete, LLP

200 W Forsyth St - Ste 1700, Po Box 41099

Jacksonville, FL 32202

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Union County Board of County Commissioners. (RH) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

#4

(#4) FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 9/8/2021. (JW) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

#5

(#5) Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Union County Board of County Commissioners.(Wheeler, Gary) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Patricia Burkel. (Birk, Matthew) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Union County Board of County Commissioners. (Wheeler, Gary) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #4 Order by Patricia Burkel. (Birk, Matthew) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #4 Order by Patricia Burkel. (Birk, Matthew) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Union County Board of County Commissioners. (Wheeler, Gary) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Patricia Burkel. (Birk, Matthew) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Union County Board of County Commissioners.(Wheeler, Gary) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 9/8/2021. (JW) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Union County Board of County Commissioners. (RH) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:21-cv-0888-MMH-JBT. (SJB) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Union County Board of County Commissioners with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18671527) filed by Patricia Burkel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Birk, Matthew) (Modified on 9/7/2021, to edit text) (BGR). (Entered: 09/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARY RANDALL WHEELER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John F. Dickinson