This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/09/2020 at 09:26:17 (UTC).

Alexis Burke v. Mercedes Benz USA, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/10/2020 Alexis Burke filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Mercedes Benz USA, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Alexander F. MacKinnon and John A. Kronstadt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-05172

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alexander F. MacKinnon

Presiding Judge

John A. Kronstadt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alexis Burke

Defendants

Mercedes-Benz USA LLC

DOES 1 through 20, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David N Barry

Attorney at Barry Law Firm

11845 West Olympic Boulevard Suite 1270

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Defendant Attorneys

Samantha Koopersmith

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group LLP

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Kate S Lehrman

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Ashley Elise Oaks

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

12 #7

Exhibit G - Hernandez Minute Order

12 #6

Exhibit F - Hernandez Motion for Att. Fees

12 #5

Exhibit E - Michel Motion for Att. Fees

12 #4

Exhibit D - Ramos Award

12 #3

Exhibit C-Ramos Mx for Attys' Fees

12 #2

Exhibit B_Lease Agreement-Redacted

12 #1

Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint

#12

10 #2

Proposed Order

10 #1

Declaration

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

1 #3

Exhibit C-Lease Agreement

1 #2

Exhibit B-MBUSA's Answer to Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #10 filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B_Lease Agreement-Redacted, #3 Exhibit C-Ramos Mx for Attys' Fees, #4 Exhibit D - Ramos Award, #5 Exhibit E - Michel Motion for Att. Fees, #6 Exhibit F - Hernandez Motion for Att. Fees, #7 Exhibit G - Hernandez Minute Order)(Koopersmith, Samantha) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND TO STATE COURT (DKT. #10 ) by Judge John A Kronstadt: Plaintiff has set the motion for a day the Court's calendar is full and, therefore, closed. Counsel are directed to refer to the Motion Calendar under this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court. Any future motion will be stricken for failing to set it on a date the Court is hearing motions. In the interest of judicial efficiency, the Court, on its own motion, continues the Motion from August 3, 2020 to August 24, 2020 at 8:30 a.m.; a Scheduling Conference hearing will also take place on August 24, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. The Rule 26 Meeting Report deadline remains August 14, 2020. Counsel shall refer to the Court's Standing Order with respect to the briefing schedule of motions. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Alexis Burke. Motion set for hearing on 8/3/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Barry, David) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/14/2020. (cw) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (cw) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketNON CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendants Mercedes-Benz USA LLC, attached as Exhibit B. (jtil) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Alexis Burke in Los Angeles Superior Court on 5/7/2020, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Jury Demand #4 served on June 10, 2020. (Koopersmith, Samantha) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA LLC.. (Koopersmith, Samantha) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA LLC, identifying ALEXIS BURKE, MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC, DAIMLER NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION. (Koopersmith, Samantha) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA LLC. (Koopersmith, Samantha) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20STCV17334 Receipt No: ACACDC-26763413 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-MBUSA's Answer to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C-Lease Agreement) (Attorney Samantha Koopersmith added to party Mercedes-Benz USA LLC(pty:dft))(Koopersmith, Samantha) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERCEDES-BENZ USA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David N Barry