This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/11/2022 at 06:34:39 (UTC).

Burke et al v. Biden et al

Case Summary

On 12/09/2021 Burke filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Biden. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Christopher H Steger and Travis R McDonough. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00049

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christopher H Steger

Presiding Judge

Travis R McDonough

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Maureen Burke

James Todd Malone

Bryan Scott Williams

Douglas Buck

William Darlington

James E. Rollins III

Brian Barnes

Denise Arnold

Michael Shadrick

William Layne

Defendants

Joseph R. Biden

Lloyd Austin III

Martin J. Walsh

National Aerospace Solutions

nLogic, Inc.

GP Strategies Corporation

Quantitech, LLC d/b/a Axient

Akima Intra-Data, LLC

Amentum Services, Inc.

CW Resources, Inc.

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Emily A. Castro

Attorney at Crain, Schuette & Associates

5214 Maryland Way, Suite 402

Brentwood, TN 37027

Larry L Crain

Attorney at Crain, Schuette & Associates

5214 Maryland Way, Suite 402

Brentwood, TN 37027

Defendant Attorneys

Brigid M Carpenter

Attorney at Baker Donelson

1600 West End Avenue, Suite 2000

Nashville, TN 37203

Craig A Cowart

Attorney at Jackson Lewis LLP (Memphis)

999 Shady Grove Road, Suite 110

Memphis, TN 38120

Patricia Anderson Pryor

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

201 E. Fifth Street, Ste 26Th Floor

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Other Attorneys

Matthew W Stiles

Attorney at Maynard, Cooper & Gale, PC (Birmingham)

1901 Sixth Avenue North, Regions Harbert Plaza

Birmingham, AL 35203-2618

Elmer E White, III

Attorney at Kullman Firm (AL)

600 University Park Place, Suite 340

Birmingham, AL 35209-6786

Jessica L. Marrero

Attorney at The Kullman Firm

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 1600

New Orleans, LA 70163

J Christopher Anderson

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C. (Nashville)

333 Commerce Street, Suite 1450

Nashville, TN 37201

Eva C Madison

Attorney at Littler Mendelson (AR)

3739 Steele Blvd., Suite 300

Fayetteville, AR 72703

 

Court Documents

#53

(#53) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case Plaintiffs' Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by Denise Arnold, Brian Barnes, Douglas Buck, Maureen Burke, William Darlington, William Layne, James Todd Malone, James E. Rollins III, Michael Shadrick, Bryan Scott Williams (Crain, Larry) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

#52

(#52) STATUS REPORT Plaintiffs' Status Report by Denise Arnold, Brian Barnes, Douglas Buck, Maureen Burke, William Darlington, William Layne, James Todd Malone, James E. Rollins III, Michael Shadrick, Bryan Scott Williams. (Crain, Larry) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#51

(#51) ORDER On February 18, 2022, the Sixth Circuit issued an order dismissing Case No. 21-4027 asmoot in light of the Supreme Courts stay of the enforcement of OSHAs vaccination and testingemergency temporary standard and OSHAs withdrawal of the emergency temporary standard.To date, however, Plaintiffs have not filed a status report. Accordingly, Plaintiffs areORDERED to file a status report on or before March 17, 2022, indicating whether there areissues remaining for resolution in this case. Plaintiffs are ON NOTICE that if no status report is filed by that date, the Court may dismiss this action with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule ofCivil Procedure 41(b) and Local Rule 68.1. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 3/11/2022. (DJH) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

#50

(#50) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Chugach Federal Solutions identifying Corporate Parent Chugach Government Solutions, LLC, Corporate Parent Chugach Alaska Corporation for Chugach Federal Solutions. (Carpenter, Brigid) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

49 #1

Other green card

#49

(#49) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Barnes, James Todd Malone, Maureen Burke, James E. Rollins III, Bryan Scott Williams, Michael Shadrick, Denise Arnold, Douglas Buck, William Layne, William Darlington. Martin J. Walsh served on 1/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Other green card)(Crain, Larry) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

#48

(#48) NOTICE by nLogic, LLC of Substitution of Counsel (Carpenter, Brigid) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#45

(#47) ORDER granting #41 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #42 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #45 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 1-10-22. (KMG) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

42 #1

Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing

1 #10

Summons Summons

1 #9

Summons Summons

1 #8

Summons Summons

1 #7

Summons Summons

1 #5

Summons Summons

1 #4

Summons Summons

1 #3

Summons Summons

1 #2

Summons Summons

1 #1

Other Civil Cover Sheet

77 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case Plaintiffs' Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by Denise Arnold, Brian Barnes, Douglas Buck, Maureen Burke, William Darlington, William Layne, James Todd Malone, James E. Rollins III, Michael Shadrick, Bryan Scott Williams (Crain, Larry) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) STATUS REPORT Plaintiffs' Status Report by Denise Arnold, Brian Barnes, Douglas Buck, Maureen Burke, William Darlington, William Layne, James Todd Malone, James E. Rollins III, Michael Shadrick, Bryan Scott Williams. (Crain, Larry) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) ORDER On February 18, 2022, the Sixth Circuit issued an order dismissing Case No. 21-4027 asmoot in light of the Supreme Courts stay of the enforcement of OSHAs vaccination and testingemergency temporary standard and OSHAs withdrawal of the emergency temporary standard.To date, however, Plaintiffs have not filed a status report. Accordingly, Plaintiffs areORDERED to file a status report on or before March 17, 2022, indicating whether there areissues remaining for resolution in this case. Plaintiffs are ON NOTICE that if no status report is filed by that date, the Court may dismiss this action with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule ofCivil Procedure 41(b) and Local Rule 68.1. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 3/11/2022. (DJH) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Chugach Federal Solutions identifying Corporate Parent Chugach Government Solutions, LLC, Corporate Parent Chugach Alaska Corporation for Chugach Federal Solutions. (Carpenter, Brigid) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • Docket*SECOND* NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Chugach Federal Solutions. (AML) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Barnes, James Todd Malone, Maureen Burke, James E. Rollins III, Bryan Scott Williams, Michael Shadrick, Denise Arnold, Douglas Buck, William Layne, William Darlington. Martin J. Walsh served on 1/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Other green card)(Crain, Larry) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) NOTICE by nLogic, LLC of Substitution of Counsel (Carpenter, Brigid) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) ORDER granting #41 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #42 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #45 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 1-10-22. (KMG) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #42 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Patricia Pryor filed by CW Resources, Inc. Pending admission application under the name of Patricia Anderson Pryor verified. (KMK) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) ORDER Based on these discussions, the Court ORDERS that the deadlines for filing responsive pleadings and responses to the motion for preliminary injunction are hereby CONTINUED, to be reset at a later date. Within fourteen days of the resolution of Sixth Circuit Case No. 21-4027, Plaintiffs shall file a status report indicating which issues they believe remain for resolution in this Court. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 1/7/2022. (DJH) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to Akima Intra-Data (Aid). (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Amentum Services LLC, #2 Summons Issued as to Chugach Federal Solutions, #3 Summons Issued as to CW Resources Inc, #4 Summons Issued as to GP Strategies Corporation, #5 Summons Issued as to National Aerospace Solutions Inc, #6 Summons Issued as to nLogic LLC, #7 Summons Issued as to Quantitech)(AML) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Joseph R. Biden, in his official capacity as President of the United States. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Lloyd Austin, Secretary of Defense, #2 Summons Issued as to Martin Walsh, Secretary of Occupational Safety and Health Administration)(AML) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to Emily Castro. (AML) Mailed to Emily Castro (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 12/10/2021. (Copy of Order mailed to Attorney Emily Castro). (LCK) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 12/10/2021. (Copy of Order mailed to Attorney Emily Castro). (LCK) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 12/10/2021. (Copy of Order mailed to Attorney Emily Castro). (LCK) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Deficiency (PDF) re #1 Complaint - Civil Cover Sheet. (LCK) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketDistrict Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (LCK) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Denise Arnold, Brian Barnes, Douglas Buck, Maureen Burke, William Darlington, William Layne, James Todd Malone, James E. Rollins III, Michael Shadrick, Bryan Scott Williams. (Crain, Larry) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Verified Complaint against Akima Intra-Data, LLC, Amentum Services, Inc., Lloyd Austin III, Joseph R. Biden, CW Resources, Inc., Chugach Federal Solutions, GP Strategies Corporation, National Aerospace Solutions, Quantitech, LLC d/b/a Axient, Martin J. Walsh, nLogic, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4919348.), filed by Brian Barnes, James Todd Malone, Maureen Burke, James E. Rollins III, Bryan Scott Williams, Michael Shadrick, Denise Arnold, Douglas Buck, William Layne, William Darlington. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons, #3 Summons Summons, #4 Summons Summons, #5 Summons Summons, #6 Summons Summons, #7 Summons Summons, #8 Summons Summons, #9 Summons Summons, #10 Summons Summons, #11 Summons Summons, #12 Summons Summons)(Crain, Larry) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/10/2021) (LCK). (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amentum Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where GP STRATEGIES CORPORATION DBA GP SANDY A SUBDIVIDION OF GP STRATEGIES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Stiles

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eva C. Madison