This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/08/2022 at 06:14:50 (UTC).

Burgos v. Ford Motor Company et al

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 Burgos filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against Ford Motor Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Anthony J. Battaglia and Andrew G. Schopler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00943

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Anthony J. Battaglia

Referral Judge

Andrew G. Schopler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

George Burgos

Defendants

Ford Motor Company

Does 1 through 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Allen Amarkarian

Attorney at Quill & Arrow, LLP

10900 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Kevin Y. Jacobson

Attorney at Quill & Arrow LLP

10900 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Defendant Attorneys

Brian Curtis Vanderhoof

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

633 West 5Th Street, Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90070

Jonathan Won

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith

650 Town Center Drive, Suite 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Certificate of Service

1 #3

Declaration of Brian C. Vanderhoof

1 #4

Declaration of Jonathan Won

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Ford Motor Company. (ggv) (sjt). (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#3

(#3) Notice of Party With Financial Interest by Ford Motor Company. Identifying Other Affiliate State Street Corporation, Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Other Affiliate State Street Bank and Trust Company for Ford Motor Company. (ggv) (sjt). (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#4

(#4) Notice and Order: (1) for Early Neutral Evaluation and (2) Setting Rule 26 Compliance and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2022 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Joint Discovery Plan due 8/15/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 6/28/2022.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrm) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Lodgment by Ford Motor Company Notice of Lodging Answer of Defendant Ford Motor Company to Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint (Won, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Declination to a Magistrate Judge by Ford Motor Company (Vanderhoof, Brian) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Declination to a Magistrate Judge by Ford Motor Company (Vanderhoof, Brian) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Lodgment by Ford Motor Company Notice of Lodging Answer of Defendant Ford Motor Company to Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint (Won, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice and Order: (1) for Early Neutral Evaluation and (2) Setting Rule 26 Compliance and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2022 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Joint Discovery Plan due 8/15/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 6/28/2022.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrm) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Party With Financial Interest by Ford Motor Company. Identifying Other Affiliate State Street Corporation, Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Other Affiliate State Street Bank and Trust Company for Ford Motor Company. (ggv) (sjt). (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Ford Motor Company. (ggv) (sjt). (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-16946647.), filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Declaration of Brian C. Vanderhoof, #4 Declaration of Jonathan Won)The new case number is 3:22-cv-943-AJB-AGS. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case.(ggv) (sjt). (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan Won