This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/18/2021 at 09:04:01 (UTC).

Burgos Rivera v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/19/2021 Burgos Rivera filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against GlaxoSmithKline LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Daniel R. Dominguez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01508

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel R. Dominguez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carmen Milagros Burgos Rivera

Defendants

GlaxoSmithKline LLC

GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc.

GlaxoSmithKline PLC

Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation

Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH

Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Boehringer Ingelheim Promeco, S.A. de C.V.

Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation

Pfizer Inc.

Sanofi US Services Inc.

Sanofi S.A.

SANOFI-AVENTIC U.S. LLC

Acic Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Methapharm, Inc.

Ajanta Pharma USA Inc.

Ajanta Pharma Ltd.

AmerisourceBergen Corporation

AmeriSource Health Services LLC

American Health Packaging

77 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eric M. Quetglas-Jordan

Attorney at Quetglas Law Office PSC

1353 Luis Vigoreaux Ave.Pmb 669

Guaynabo, PR 00966

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Category Sheet

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#5

(#5) Minute Order to involved Clerks entered in MDL #2924 informing of the electronic transfer to the Southern District of Florida. Order becomes effective upon receipt of a certified copy of CTO-80 from the transferee court. Signed by Clerk of the Multidistrict Litigation Panel John W. Nichols on 11/9/2021. (mg) Modified on 11/12/2021 to correct date (mg). (Entered: 11/12/2021)

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

NEF

6 #2

Tag Along

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Transmittal Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketCase transferred from Puerto Rico has been opened in Southern District of Florida as case 9:21-cv-82083, filed 11/17/2021. (gav) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketCase transferred out to the Southern District of Florida through the extract civil case utility, Sending e-mail to: CMECF_CaseTransfers@flsd.uscourts.gov ... Extraction Completed (mg) Modified on 11/12/2021 to edit docket text (mg). (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFIED COPY OF (CTO-80) received from the Southern District of Florida. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter). (mg) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-80) FINALIZED for the transfer of this case to the Southern District of Florida re: MDL # 2924. Signed by Clerk of the Multidistrict Litigation Panel, John W. Nichols on 11/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 NEF, #2 Tag Along).(mg) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Minute Order to involved Clerks entered in MDL #2924 informing of the electronic transfer to the Southern District of Florida. Order becomes effective upon receipt of a certified copy of CTO-80 from the transferee court. Signed by Clerk of the Multidistrict Litigation Panel John W. Nichols on 11/9/2021. (mg) Modified on 11/12/2021 to correct date (mg). (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion to transfer case. This action shall be conditionally transferred to the Southern District of Florida and to be assigned to the Honorable Robin L. Rosenberg, Case 20-MD-02924. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 10/20/2021. (CBM) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (arg) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to transfer case filed by Eric M. Quetglas-Jordan on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/29/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Quetglas-Jordan, Eric) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7496657.), filed by Carmen Milagros Burgos Rivera. Service due by 1/18/2022, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Quetglas-Jordan, Eric) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Methapharm, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Amerisource Health Services, LLC d/b/a American Health Packaging is a litigant

Latest cases where Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH is a litigant