This case was last updated from PACER on 02/16/2021 at 11:21:10 (UTC).

Burgo v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al

Case Summary

On 12/18/2020 Burgo filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Life Insurance Company of North America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Janis L. Sammartino and Bernard G. Skomal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-02466

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Janis L. Sammartino

Referral Judge

Bernard G. Skomal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wendy Burgo

Defendants

Does 1 Through 10

Life Insurance Company of North America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert John McKennon

Attorney at McKennon Law Group

20321 Sw Birch Street, Suite 200

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Defendant Attorney

Keiko J Kojima

Attorney at Burke, Williams & Sorensen

444 South Flower Street, Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER Granting #6 Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant must file its response to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 2/19/2021. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/27/2021. (tcf) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

#6

(#6) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Kojima, Keiko)Attorney Keiko J Kojima added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft) (tcf). (Entered: 01/26/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wendy Burgo. Life Insurance Company of North America served. (McKennon, Robert) (tcf). (Entered: 01/11/2021)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued by Robert John McKennon on behalf of Wendy Burgo (McKennon, Robert) (tcf). (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued by Robert John McKennon on behalf of Wendy Burgo (McKennon, Robert) QC mailer sent re: missing case number in the caption (tcf). (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (zda)(jrd) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Against Life Insurance Company of North America, Does 1 Through 10 (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number ACASDC-15075528.), filed by Wendy Burgo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-2466-JLS-BGS. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (McKennon, Robert)(zda)(jrd) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Granting #6 Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant must file its response to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 2/19/2021. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/27/2021. (tcf) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Kojima, Keiko)Attorney Keiko J Kojima added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft) (tcf). (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wendy Burgo. Life Insurance Company of North America served. (McKennon, Robert) (tcf). (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued by Robert John McKennon on behalf of Wendy Burgo (McKennon, Robert) (tcf). (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued by Robert John McKennon on behalf of Wendy Burgo (McKennon, Robert) QC mailer sent re: missing case number in the caption (tcf). (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (zda)(jrd) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Against Life Insurance Company of North America, Does 1 Through 10 (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number ACASDC-15075528.), filed by Wendy Burgo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-2466-JLS-BGS. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (McKennon, Robert)(zda)(jrd) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Life Insurance Company of North America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert John McKennon