This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/02/2022 at 08:36:50 (UTC).

Burgess v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company et al

Case Summary

On 06/03/2022 Burgess filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Norfolk Southern Railway Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Frank P. Geraci, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-06251

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Frank P. Geraci, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joyce Burgess

Defendants

Norfolk Southern Railway Company

Pennsylvania Lines, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Megan K. Collins

Attorney at Welch, Donlon & Czarples, PLLC

8 Denison Pkwy E., Suite 203

Corning, NY 14830

Defendant Attorney

John E. Young, IV

Attorney at Flynn Wirkus Young, P.C.

70 Niagara Street, Suite 111

Buffalo, NY 14202

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit A

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #5

Exhibit C

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Railway Company and Pennsylvania Lines, LLC. (TMK) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Affidavit

#4

(#4) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff is hereby Ordered to Show Cause in writing by July 15, 2022, why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 6/27/2022. (BJJ) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#5

(#5) DECLARATION re #4 Order to Show Cause filed by Joyce Burgess filed by Joyce Burgess. (Collins, Megan) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Norfolk Southern Railway Company.(Young, John) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Young, IV on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Young, John) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Norfolk Southern Railway Company identifying Corporate Parent Norfolk Southern Corporation for Norfolk Southern Railway Company.. (Young, John) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Norfolk Southern Railway Company identifying Corporate Parent Norfolk Southern Corporation for Norfolk Southern Railway Company.. (Young, John) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Young, IV on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Young, John) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Norfolk Southern Railway Company.(Young, John) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DECLARATION re #4 Order to Show Cause filed by Joyce Burgess filed by Joyce Burgess. (Collins, Megan) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff is hereby Ordered to Show Cause in writing by July 15, 2022, why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 6/27/2022. (BJJ) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-Filing Notification: Please note for future reference that the proper event is summons returned executed. No action required re #3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Civil Cover Sheet with Summons and Complaint. (TF) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRE #3 - SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joyce Burgess. Norfolk Southern Railway Company served on 6/9/2022, answer due 6/30/2022; Pennsylvania Lines, LLC served on 6/9/2022, answer due 6/30/2022. (TF) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Civil Cover Sheet with Summons and Complaint served on Defendants on 06/09/2022, filed by Joyce Burgess. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Collins, Megan) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Railway Company and Pennsylvania Lines, LLC. (TMK) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketAUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 402 receipt number ANYWDC-4594792, filed by Joyce Burgess. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(Collins, Megan) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY is a litigant