This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2020 at 09:44:40 (UTC).

Burgess v. Brockhart et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2020 Burgess filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Brockhart. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jorge L. Alonso. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-04216

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jorge L. Alonso

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Herbert Burgess

Sumner, IL 62466

Respondents

Brookhart

Attorney General of the State of Illinois

Dr. Deanna Brockhart

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Chief of Criminal Appeals

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

100 West Randolph - 12 Floor

Chicago, IL 60601

Richard Joseph Cook

Attorney at Office Of The Illinois Attorney General

100 West Randolph Street, 12Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Deanna Brockhart by Richard Joseph Cook (Cook, Richard) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER : Respondent shall answer or otherwise respond to the habeas corpus petition #1 by November 6, 2020. Petitioner shall reply by January 8, 2021. The Clerk is instructed to terminate Respondent Attorney General of the State of Illinois. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/8/2020. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER: Petitioner's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied. Petitioner is ordered to pay the $5.00 statutory filing fee by September 21, 2020. Failure to comply with this order may result in summary dismissal of this case. Petitioner's motion for attorney representation #4 is denied as premature. The Clerk is instructed to update the docket to reflect that Respondent is Dr. Deanna Brockhart, Acting Warden, Lawrence Correctional Center. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 8/21/2020. Mailed notice. (sxb, ) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#7

(#7) FILED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Herbert Burgess (Exhibits) (sxb, ) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION by Petitioner Herbert Burgess for attorney representation. (smm, ) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#3

(#3) APPLICATION and Financial Affidavit by Petitioner Herbert Burgess for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; (Attachment). (smm, ) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#2

(#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (smm, ) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#1

(#1) RECEIVED PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Herbert Burgess against Attorney General of the State of Illinois, Brookhart; (Affidavit);(Attachments). (smm, ) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#5

(#5) Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020. Mailed notice(smm, ) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Deanna Brockhart by Richard Joseph Cook (Cook, Richard) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER : Respondent shall answer or otherwise respond to the habeas corpus petition #1 by November 6, 2020. Petitioner shall reply by January 8, 2021. The Clerk is instructed to terminate Respondent Attorney General of the State of Illinois. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/8/2020. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: Petitioner's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied. Petitioner is ordered to pay the $5.00 statutory filing fee by September 21, 2020. Failure to comply with this order may result in summary dismissal of this case. Petitioner's motion for attorney representation #4 is denied as premature. The Clerk is instructed to update the docket to reflect that Respondent is Dr. Deanna Brockhart, Acting Warden, Lawrence Correctional Center. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 8/21/2020. Mailed notice. (sxb, ) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FILED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Herbert Burgess (Exhibits) (sxb, ) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION by Petitioner Herbert Burgess for attorney representation. (smm, ) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPLICATION and Financial Affidavit by Petitioner Herbert Burgess for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; (Attachment). (smm, ) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (smm, ) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) RECEIVED PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Herbert Burgess against Attorney General of the State of Illinois, Brookhart; (Affidavit);(Attachments). (smm, ) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020. Mailed notice(smm, ) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less