This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/28/2022 at 08:07:49 (UTC).

Burgess v. Alltran Financial, LP et al

Case Summary

On 11/29/2021 Burgess filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Alltran Financial, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Marcia M. Henry and Eric R. Komitee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-06626

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Marcia M. Henry

Presiding Judge

Eric R. Komitee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Owen Burgess

Defendants

Alltran Financial, LP

CACV of Colorado, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Uri Horowitz

Attorney at Horowitz Law, PLLC

14441 70Th Road

Flushing, NY 11367

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Proposed Summons Alltran Financial, LP

1 #4

Proposed Summons CACV of Colorado, LLC

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

CACV summons

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Owen Burgess. Alltran Financial, LP waiver sent on 12/6/2021, answer due 2/4/2022. (Horowitz, Uri) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Owen Burgess. CACV of Colorado, LLC served on 12/23/2021, answer due 1/13/2022. (Horowitz, Uri) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Owen Burgess. CACV of Colorado, LLC served on 12/23/2021, answer due 1/13/2022. (Horowitz, Uri) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Owen Burgess. Alltran Financial, LP waiver sent on 12/6/2021, answer due 2/4/2022. (Horowitz, Uri) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 CACV summons) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Eric R. Komitee and Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Alltran Financial, LP, CACV of Colorado, LLC filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15066640 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Owen Burgess. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Alltran Financial, LP, #4 Proposed Summons CACV of Colorado, LLC) (Horowitz, Uri) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLTRAN FINANCIAL, LP is a litigant

Latest cases where CACV of Colorado LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Uri Horowitz