This case was last updated from PACER on 03/16/2020 at 07:39:10 (UTC).

Burdette v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 01/16/2020 Burdette filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are J. Phil Gilbert and Mark A. Beatty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00069

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Phil Gilbert

Referral Judge

Mark A. Beatty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lindsey Jo Burdette

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Howard D. Olinsky

Attorney at Olinsky Law Group

250 S. Clinton Street, Suite 210

Syracuse, NY 13202-1067

 

Court Documents

#7

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, granting #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lindsey Jo Burdette. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 1/21/2020. (jdh) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2020
  • Docket(#8) Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 260, this case is transferred from Magistrate Donald G. Wilkerson and reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty. All deadlines and schedules previously set by or before Magistrate G. Wilkerson shall remain in effect. All future pleadings shall bear the case number 20-69-JPG-MAB. (trb) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Olinsky, Howard) (Entered: 02/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. Original mailed to Attorney Howard D. Olinsky. (tba) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, granting #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lindsey Jo Burdette. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 1/21/2020. (jdh) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson assigned. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-00069-JPG-DGW. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (tba) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Howard D. Olinsky on behalf of Lindsey Jo Burdette (Olinsky, Howard) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lindsey Jo Burdette. (Olinsky, Howard) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Lindsey Jo Burdette. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Olinsky, Howard) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less