This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2021 at 16:18:05 (UTC).

Burchfield v. Saul

Case Summary

On 05/24/2021 Burchfield filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alfred H Bennett and Frances H Stacy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01755

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alfred H Bennett

Referral Judge

Frances H Stacy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ricky Burchfield

Defendant

Andrew Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Madison Tate Donaldson

Attorney at Marc Whitehead Assoc.

430 Heights Boulevard

Houston, TX 77007

 

Court Documents

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#5

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN of Service Executed as to Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Region VI on 06/16/2021 re: summons, filed.(CynthiaBenavides, 3) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Ricky Burchfield, filed.(Donaldson, Madison) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN of Service Executed as to U.S. Attorney, Southern District of Texas on 6/9/21 re: Summons, filed.(jtabares, 1) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, U.S. Attorney's Office, and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation, #2 Continuation)(DesireeSillas, 4) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(DesireeSillas, 4) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Andrew Saul, Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, United States Attorney General, and United States Attorney's Office, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Summons, #4 Exhibit Summons, #5 Exhibit Summons, #6 Exhibit Summons, #7 Exhibit Summons)(Donaldson, Madison) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul filed by Ricky Burchfield (Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis granted on 5/24/21 by Judge Alfred H Bennett). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ltien, 4) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Madison Tate Donaldson