This case was last updated from PACER on 02/13/2021 at 19:12:04 (UTC).

Burchfield v. Jones et al

Case Summary

On 12/15/2020 Burchfield filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Jones. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Timothy L. Brooks and Erin L. Wiedemann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-06150

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy L. Brooks

Referral Judge

Erin L. Wiedemann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bradley C. Burchfield

Hot Springs, AR 71913-9542

Defendants

Members of US Congress

John Doe Director of DEA

Judge Barry Bryant

Jack Ma

William Barr

Chief Steven Elrod

John Doe Director of U.S. Secret Service

Jeff Bezos

Nurse Betty

Doe ADC Director

Donald Trump

Doe Arkansas Community Corrections Director

Trent Daniels

Gina Haskell

Asa Hutchinson

John Doe Director of CDC

General Assembly of Arkansas Members

Dr. Absalom Tilloy

Lieutenant Stapleton

17 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked Return to Sender. Mail originally sent to Bradley Burchfield at PO Box 1644 Hot Springs, AR. 71902 including #14 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Bradley C. Burchfield, #13 Notice of Change of Address, #15 Notice (Other) filed by Bradley C. Burchfield. No new address available. New Address due by 3/15/2021. (jlm) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of filing form 8888 of 2015 by Bradley C. Burchfield. (lw) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#14

(#14) MOTION for Change of Venue by Bradley C. Burchfield. Motions referred to Erin L. Wiedemann.(lw) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Change of Address for Bradley Burchfield. There are no documents to resend. (jlm) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#10

(#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Bradley C. Burchfield.(lw) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#8

(#8) CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Initial Fee directing Garland County Sheriff to collect from petitioner's prison account an initial partial filing fee of $15.30; thereafter to collect monthly payments from petitioner's prison account in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350.00 filing fee is paid in full (cc: Garland County Sheriff). (lw) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Change of Address for Bradley C. Burchfield. There are no documents to resend. (lw) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Bradley C. Burchfield. Motions referred to Erin L. Wiedemann.(mll) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

#3

(#3) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#2

(#2) ORDER that the matter has been provisionally filed as the undersigned finds that additional information is needed to rule on Plaintiff's IFP application. Specifically the Court requires the following information: completed IFP application. Failure to comply within the time period specified could result in summary dismissal for failure to obey a court order. Completed IFP due by 1/6/2021. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on December 15, 2020. (mjm) Modified on 12/15/2020 to edit deadline date (mjm). (Entered: 12/15/2020)

1 #1

Motion to Proceed Pro Se

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Bryan Achorn, William Barr, Tim Beckham, Betty, Jeff Bezos, Barry Bryant, Trent Daniels, Richard Davis, Robert T. Dawson, Doe ADC Director, Doe Arkansas Community Corrections Director, John Doe Director of CDC, John Doe Director of DEA, John Doe Director of U.S. Secret Service, Steven Elrod, General Assembly of Arkansas Members, Gina Haskell, Hernsberger, Susan O. Hickey, Asa Hutchinson, Briggette Johnson, Joe Jones, Michelle Lawrence, Jack Ma, Mike McCormick, Members of US Congress, Members of US Senate, Members of the Arkansas Bar Association, Ohms (Holmes), Leslie Rutledge, Stapleton, Absalom Tilloy, Donald Trump, Homer Wright, filed by Bradley C. Burchfield. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Proceed Pro Se)(mjm) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked Return to Sender. Mail originally sent to Bradley Burchfield at PO Box 1644 Hot Springs, AR. 71902 including #14 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Bradley C. Burchfield, #13 Notice of Change of Address, #15 Notice (Other) filed by Bradley C. Burchfield. No new address available. New Address due by 3/15/2021. (jlm) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) TEXT ONLY ORDER denying #14 Motion to Change Venue. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C.A. 1391 venue is proper in this District. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on February 4, 2021. (klk) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of filing form 8888 of 2015 by Bradley C. Burchfield. (lw) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Change of Venue by Bradley C. Burchfield. Motions referred to Erin L. Wiedemann.(lw) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Change of Address for Bradley Burchfield. There are no documents to resend. (jlm) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • Docket(#12) TEXT ONLY ORDER REGARDING In Forma Pauperis Application. Plaintiff filed a Notice of Change of Address indicating the he has now been released from custody. When a Plaintiff is released from confinement, the policy of the Court is to require re-submission of affidavits to determine whether he should be required to pay all, or a portion of, the fees and costs of the lawsuit. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this lawsuit, he is directed to pay the balance of the 350.00 dollar filing fee, or to resubmit an IFP application which reflects his free-world financial status within 21 days of the date of this Order. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT: the Clerk is directed to send a blank IFP Application to the Plaintiff. Plaintiff is directed to submit the balance of the 350.00 dollar filing fee or complete and sign the IFP Application within 21 days. This case shall be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to pay the 350.00 dollar filing fee or resubmit an IFP application by the deadline. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP Completed IFP due by 2/9/2021. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on January 19, 2021. (klk) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketSet Deadline: Completed Appeal IFP due by 1/27/2021. Blank IFP form provided to Plaintiff. (lw) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 5 Order, by Bradley C. Burchfield. ( via U.S. Postal Service: Bradley C. Burchfield ) (Attachments: #1 Letter from 8USCA dated 12/31/2020)(lw) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Bradley C. Burchfield.(lw) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Initial Fee directing Garland County Sheriff to collect from petitioner's prison account an initial partial filing fee of $15.30; thereafter to collect monthly payments from petitioner's prison account in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350.00 filing fee is paid in full (cc: Garland County Sheriff). (lw) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. The Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee in the amount of $ 350.00. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on January 4, 2021. (klk) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Change of Address for Bradley C. Burchfield. There are no documents to resend. (lw) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Bradley C. Burchfield. Motions referred to Erin L. Wiedemann.(mll) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • Docket(#5) TEXT ONLY ORDER: With the exception of the IFP application and Amended Complaint that Plaintiff was ordered to submit, the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to accept no further amendments, supplements, or motions from Plaintiff without prior approval from the Court. The Clerk is directed to return any filings tendered by Plaintiff to him until further order of this Court. Mr. Burchfield is also ADVISED that he may not submit filings for cases in which he is not the plaintiff. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on December 17, 2020. (klk) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ONLY ORDER REGARDING COMPLAINT DEFICIENCY. After review of the Complaint, it is determined that the Plaintiff did not submit the complaint on the court-approved form for this District. For this reason, Plaintiff is directed to submit an Amended Complaint within 21 days of the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to mail the Plaintiff a court-approved 1983 form.In the Amended Complaint, Plaintiff must write short, plain statements telling the Court: the constitutional right Plaintiff believes was violated;the name of the Defendant who violated the right;exactly what the Defendant did or failed to do;how the action or inaction of that Defendant is connected to the violation of the constitutional rights;and what specific injury Plaintiff suffered because of the misconduct of that Defendant. See Rizzo v. Goode, 423 U.S. 362,371-72,377 (1976);Fed.R.Civ.P.8. Plaintiff must repeat this process for each person he has named as a Defendant. Plaintiff is CAUTIONED that he must affirmatively link the conduct of each named Defendant with the specific injury he suffered. If he fails to do so, the allegations against that Defendant will be dismissed for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff is also ADVISED that he may ONLY address injuries to himself.Plaintiff must clearly designate on the face of the document that it is a First Amended Complaint. The First Amended Complaint must be retyped or rewritten in its entirety on the court-approved form. You may not refer back to any part of the original complaint. A First Amended Complaint supersedes, or takes the place of, the original Complaint. After amendment, the Court will treat the original Complaint as nonexistent. Any cause of action that was raised in the original Complaint is waived if it is not raised in the First Amended Complaint. This case shall be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to return the Amended Complaint to the Court by the deadline. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP Amended Complaint due by 1/6/2021. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on December 16, 2020. (klk) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER that the matter has been provisionally filed as the undersigned finds that additional information is needed to rule on Plaintiff's IFP application. Specifically the Court requires the following information: completed IFP application. Failure to comply within the time period specified could result in summary dismissal for failure to obey a court order. Completed IFP due by 1/6/2021. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on December 15, 2020. (mjm) Modified on 12/15/2020 to edit deadline date (mjm). (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Bryan Achorn, William Barr, Tim Beckham, Betty, Jeff Bezos, Barry Bryant, Trent Daniels, Richard Davis, Robert T. Dawson, Doe ADC Director, Doe Arkansas Community Corrections Director, John Doe Director of CDC, John Doe Director of DEA, John Doe Director of U.S. Secret Service, Steven Elrod, General Assembly of Arkansas Members, Gina Haskell, Hernsberger, Susan O. Hickey, Asa Hutchinson, Briggette Johnson, Joe Jones, Michelle Lawrence, Jack Ma, Mike McCormick, Members of US Congress, Members of US Senate, Members of the Arkansas Bar Association, Ohms (Holmes), Leslie Rutledge, Stapleton, Absalom Tilloy, Donald Trump, Homer Wright, filed by Bradley C. Burchfield. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Proceed Pro Se)(mjm) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Members of US Congress is a litigant