This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/15/2022 at 20:57:39 (UTC).

Burch v. Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/19/2019 Burch filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Douglas P. Woodlock. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-10957

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Douglas P. Woodlock

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thelma Burch

Defendants

Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc.

Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. dba Fresenius Medical Care North America (ALIAS)

Fresenius USA, Inc.

Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc.

Fresenius USA Sales, Inc.

FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC.

FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC. doing business as Fresenius Medical Care North America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Baird A Brown

Attorney at Law Offices of Baird Brown

1200, 3055 Wilshire Blvd.

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Defendant Attorneys

Juanita R. Brooks

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C.

12390 El Camino Real

San Diego, CA 92130

Carolin Sahimi

Attorney at Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP

350 S. Grand Avenue, Suite 3600

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3442

David H. Stern

Attorney at Dechert LLP

633 W. 5Th Street, Suite 4900

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2032

Maria R. Durant

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

100 High Street, 20Th Flr.

Boston, MA 02110

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Complaint

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2019
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF MDL CASE CLOSED, Direct file in the District of Massachusetts. In Re: Fresenius/Granuflo Naturalyte Dialysate Products Liability Litigation, MDL 2428. (DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. dba Fresenius Medical Care North America (ALIAS), Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.. (Durant, Maria) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Maria R. Durant on behalf of FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDINGS, INC., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA Sales, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc.(Kinsella, Devan) (Kinsella, Devan). (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • (#3) NOTICE OF MDL CASE OPENED, Direct file in the District of Massachusetts; Burch v. Frresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc., et al. In Re: Fresenius/Granuflo Naturalyte Dialysate Products Liability Litigation, MDL 2428. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • (#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER SEVERING PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(Montes, Mariliz) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FRESENIUS USA SALES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FRESENIUS USA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FRESINIUS MEDICAL CARE HOLDING INC. is a litigant