This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/12/2022 at 08:57:55 (UTC).

Burch v. Alabama Department of Corrections et al

Case Summary

On 06/13/2022 Burch filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Alabama Department of Corrections. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Callie V. S. Granade and Katherine P. Nelson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00225

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Callie V. S. Granade

Referral Judge

Katherine P. Nelson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

Vincent Burch

Atmore, AL 36503

Defendants

Alabama Department of Corrections

Officer Richie

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) 1983 COMPLAINT against Alabama Department of Corrections, Officer Richie, filed by Vincent Burch. Referred to MJ Nelson (PSU). (fz) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/14/2022: #1 Cover Letter) (fz). (Entered: 06/14/2022)

1 #1

Cover Letter

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Vincent Burch. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (PSU) (fz) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

#3

(#3) ORDER GRANTING #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Vincent Burch. Plaintiff is to REMIT to the Clerk of the United States District court for this District, by 7/15/2022, a money order for $13.97 made payable to "Clerk, U.S. District Court." Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/15/2022. Copy mailed to plaintiff. (fz) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Vincent Burch. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (PSU) (fz) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to pay filing fee filed by Vincent Burch. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (PSU) (fz) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

5 #1

Cover Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to pay filing fee filed by Vincent Burch. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (PSU) (fz) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Vincent Burch. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (PSU) (fz) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER GRANTING #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Vincent Burch. Plaintiff is to REMIT to the Clerk of the United States District court for this District, by 7/15/2022, a money order for $13.97 made payable to "Clerk, U.S. District Court." Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/15/2022. Copy mailed to plaintiff. (fz) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Vincent Burch. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (PSU) (fz) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) 1983 COMPLAINT against Alabama Department of Corrections, Officer Richie, filed by Vincent Burch. Referred to MJ Nelson (PSU). (fz) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/14/2022: #1 Cover Letter) (fz). (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Alabama Department of Corrections is a litigant