This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2021 at 17:30:44 (UTC).

Burberry Limited et al v. Various John Does et al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2020 Burberry Limited filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Various John Does. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lois Bloom and Eric R. Komitee. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-05545

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lois Bloom

Presiding Judge

Eric R. Komitee

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gianni Versace, S.R.L.

Burberry Limited

Cartier

Michael Kors, L.L.C.

River Light V, L.P.

Louis Vuitton Malletier

Hermes International

Tory Burch LLC

Cartier International AG

The North Face Apparel Corp.

Defendants

Jane Does

XYZ Companies

Various John Does

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Heather J. McDonald

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

Kevin M Wallace

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

Robertson Drake Beckerlegge

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza, 11Th Floor

New York, NY 10111

 

Court Documents

30 #1

Electronic entry terminating civil case

#30

(#30) Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Attachments: #1 Electronic entry terminating civil case) (Hong, Loan) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

#29

(#29) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Burberry Limited, Cartier, Cartier International AG, Gianni Versace, S.R.L., Hermes International, Louis Vuitton Malletier, Michael Kors, L.L.C., River Light V, L.P., The North Face Apparel Corp., Tory Burch LLC (Wallace, Kevin) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#28

(#28) Letter re: Status Update by Burberry Limited, Cartier, Cartier International AG, Gianni Versace, S.R.L., Hermes International, Louis Vuitton Malletier, Michael Kors, L.L.C., River Light V, L.P., The North Face Apparel Corp., Tory Burch LLC (Wallace, Kevin) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#27

(#27) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Preliminary Injunction Order served on John Doe Defendant on December 23, 2020, filed by Burberry Limited, Cartier, Cartier International AG, Gianni Versace, S.R.L., Hermes International, Louis Vuitton Malletier, Michael Kors, L.L.C., River Light V, L.P., The North Face Apparel Corp., Tory Burch LLC. (Wallace, Kevin) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#26

(#26) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Preliminary Injunction Order served on Extra Space Storage on December 23, 2020, filed by Burberry Limited, Cartier, Cartier International AG, Gianni Versace, S.R.L., Hermes International, Louis Vuitton Malletier, Michael Kors, L.L.C., River Light V, L.P., The North Face Apparel Corp., Tory Burch LLC. (Wallace, Kevin) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#25

(#25) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION -- The Defendants and their respective principals, officers, agents, servants, employees, and attorneys, and all persons in concert and participation with them are hereby restrained and enjoined, pending termination of this action. By February 10, 2021, Plaintiffs shall file a letter with the Court advising of the status of Plaintiffs investigations into the Defendants identities and Plaintiffs plans with respect to amendment of the Complaint. ORDER ATTACHED. Ordered by Judge Eric R. Komitee on 12/10/2020. (Guy, Alicia) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

24 #3

Comparison of Proposed Preliminary Injunction Order

24 #2

Proposed Preliminary Injunction Order

2 #2

Declaration Wallace

2 #1

Sealing Proposed Order

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by Burberry Limited, Cartier, Cartier International AG, Gianni Versace, S.R.L., Hermes International, Louis Vuitton Malletier, Michael Kors, L.L.C., River Light V, L.P., The North Face Apparel Corp., Tory Burch LLC. (Attachments: #1 Sealing Proposed Order) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2020: #2 Declaration Wallace) (Bowens, Priscilla). (Entered: 11/13/2020)

1 #5

Affidavit

1 #4

Sealing Cover Sheet

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet (Dummy Signed)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Cartier, The North Face Apparel Corp., Gianni Versace, S.R.L., Louis Vuitton Malletier, River Light V, L.P., Hermes International, Burberry Limited, Tory Burch LLC, Michael Kors, L.L.C., Cartier International AG. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet (Dummy Signed), #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Sealing Cover Sheet, #5 Affidavit) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/24/2021) (Lee, Tiffeny). (Entered: 11/13/2020)

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Attachments: #1 Electronic entry terminating civil case) (Hong, Loan) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. (Guy, Alicia) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Burberry Limited, Cartier, Cartier International AG, Gianni Versace, S.R.L., Hermes International, Louis Vuitton Malletier, Michael Kors, L.L.C., River Light V, L.P., The North Face Apparel Corp., Tory Burch LLC (Wallace, Kevin) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Letter re: Status Update by Burberry Limited, Cartier, Cartier International AG, Gianni Versace, S.R.L., Hermes International, Louis Vuitton Malletier, Michael Kors, L.L.C., River Light V, L.P., The North Face Apparel Corp., Tory Burch LLC (Wallace, Kevin) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Preliminary Injunction Order served on John Doe Defendant on December 23, 2020, filed by Burberry Limited, Cartier, Cartier International AG, Gianni Versace, S.R.L., Hermes International, Louis Vuitton Malletier, Michael Kors, L.L.C., River Light V, L.P., The North Face Apparel Corp., Tory Burch LLC. (Wallace, Kevin) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Preliminary Injunction Order served on Extra Space Storage on December 23, 2020, filed by Burberry Limited, Cartier, Cartier International AG, Gianni Versace, S.R.L., Hermes International, Louis Vuitton Malletier, Michael Kors, L.L.C., River Light V, L.P., The North Face Apparel Corp., Tory Burch LLC. (Wallace, Kevin) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION -- The Defendants and their respective principals, officers, agents, servants, employees, and attorneys, and all persons in concert and participation with them are hereby restrained and enjoined, pending termination of this action. By February 10, 2021, Plaintiffs shall file a letter with the Court advising of the status of Plaintiffs investigations into the Defendants identities and Plaintiffs plans with respect to amendment of the Complaint. ORDER ATTACHED. Ordered by Judge Eric R. Komitee on 12/10/2020. (Guy, Alicia) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Letter to Honorable Eric R. Komittee from Kevin M. Wallace dated December 10, 2020 re: Hearing on December 9, 2020 by Burberry Limited, Cartier, Cartier International AG, Gianni Versace, S.R.L., Hermes International, Louis Vuitton Malletier, Michael Kors, L.L.C., River Light V, L.P., The North Face Apparel Corp., Tory Burch LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Robert Dowd, #2 Proposed Preliminary Injunction Order, #3 Comparison of Proposed Preliminary Injunction Order) (Wallace, Kevin) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eric R. Komitee: Telephone Show Cause Hearing held on 12/9/2020. Case called. No appearance on behalf of defendants. No later than December 10, 2020, Plaintiffs shall submit an affidavit from the investigator; a letter addressing the legal authority to seek expedited discovery; and a revised proposed preliminary injunction order. The Clerk of Court is directed to unseal this case.(Electronically recorded.) (Guy, Alicia) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Seizure Warrant Returned Executed. Served on 11/23/2020. (Fernandez, Erica) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by The North Face Apparel Corp.. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Michael Kors, L.L.C.. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Louis Vuitton Malletier. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Gianni Versace, S.R.L.. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Hermes International. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Cartier. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Burberry Limited. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Burberry Limited, Cartier, Cartier International AG, Gianni Versace, S.R.L., Hermes International, Louis Vuitton Malletier, Michael Kors, L.L.C., River Light V, L.P., The North Face Apparel Corp., Tory Burch LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2020: #2 Declaration Versace, #3 Declaration Tory Burch, #4 Declaration The North Face, #5 Declaration Michael Kors, #6 Declaration Louis Vuitton, #7 Declaration Hermes, #8 Declaration Cartier, #9 Declaration Burberry) (Bowens, Priscilla). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/19/2020: #10 DECLARATION OF KEVIN M. WALLACE) (Marziliano, August). (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by Burberry Limited, Cartier, Cartier International AG, Gianni Versace, S.R.L., Hermes International, Louis Vuitton Malletier, Michael Kors, L.L.C., River Light V, L.P., The North Face Apparel Corp., Tory Burch LLC. (Attachments: #1 Sealing Proposed Order) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2020: #2 Declaration Wallace) (Bowens, Priscilla). (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Cartier, The North Face Apparel Corp., Gianni Versace, S.R.L., Louis Vuitton Malletier, River Light V, L.P., Hermes International, Burberry Limited, Tory Burch LLC, Michael Kors, L.L.C., Cartier International AG. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet (Dummy Signed), #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Sealing Cover Sheet, #5 Affidavit) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/24/2021) (Lee, Tiffeny). (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hermes International Fund Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where River Light V, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where The North Face Apparel Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where TORY BURCH LLC is a litigant