This case was last updated from PACER on 06/01/2021 at 08:20:09 (UTC).

Burberry Limited, a United Kingdom company et al v. The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations set forth on Schedule A

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 Burberry Limited, a United Kingdom company filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations set forth on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James I. Cohn and Jared M. Strauss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-60717

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James I. Cohn

Referral Judge

Jared M. Strauss

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Burberry Limited, a United Kingdom company

Burberry Limited, a New York Corporation

Defendants

THE INDIVIDUALS, PARTNERSHIPS AND UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIATIONS IDENTIFIED ON SCHEDULE A,

DDKKYL&

Maylis Life Store

brandwholesalers

fxh15873358738

samchen420

chen4686

ddcc8682

huang0102

zl1745

tangfei2018

ziyong07

ttt0917

sanhu2062

.Brand-Online Store

louisvuitton_good

junwei06

Military Flapship Store

300 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez

Attorney at Stephen M. Gaffigan, P.A.

401 East Las Olas Boulevard, Suite 130-453

Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33301

Stephen Michael Gaffigan

Attorney at Stpehen M. Gaffigan, P.A.

401 East Las Olas Blvd., #130-453

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316

Christine Ann Daley

Attorney at Stephen M. Gaffigan, P.A.

401 East Las Olas Boulevard, Suite 130-453

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Virgilio Gigante

Attorney at Stephen M Gaffigan PA

401 E Las Olas Boulevard, #130-453

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

#28

(#28) ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re granted #6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Order Restraining Transfer of Assets filed by Burberry Limited, a New York Corporation, Burberry Limited, a United Kingdom company Signed by Senior Judge James I. Cohn on 4/29/2021. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

#25

(#25) Exhibit List in Connection with Preliminary Injunction Hearing Scheduled for April 29, 2021 by Burberry Limited, a New York Corporation, Burberry Limited, a United Kingdom company.. (Daley, Christine) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#24

(#24) Witness List in Connection with Preliminary Injunction Hearing Scheduled for April 29, 2021 by Burberry Limited, a New York Corporation, Burberry Limited, a United Kingdom company.. (Daley, Christine) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#18

(#22) NOTICE by Burberry Limited, a New York Corporation, Burberry Limited, a United Kingdom company re #1 Complaint, #8 Sealed Order on Motion,, Order on Ex Parte Motion, #6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Order Restraining Transfer of Assets , #14 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION To Extend Temporary Restraining Order and Continue Hearing Scheduled for April 15, 2021 in Connection with Motion for Preliminary Injunction , #15 Order on Ex Parte Motion, #18 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #17 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, upon Defendants via Electronic Mail (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Sevice) (Gaffigan, Stephen) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#15

(#22) NOTICE by Burberry Limited, a New York Corporation, Burberry Limited, a United Kingdom company re #1 Complaint, #8 Sealed Order on Motion,, Order on Ex Parte Motion, #6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Order Restraining Transfer of Assets , #14 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION To Extend Temporary Restraining Order and Continue Hearing Scheduled for April 15, 2021 in Connection with Motion for Preliminary Injunction , #15 Order on Ex Parte Motion, #18 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #17 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, upon Defendants via Electronic Mail (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Sevice) (Gaffigan, Stephen) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 1/24/2022 at 09:00 AM before Senior Judge James I. Cohn. Calendar Call set for 1/20/2022 at 09:00 AM before Senior Judge James I. Cohn. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss to conduct a Scheduling Conference and for appropriate disposition of all pro hac vice motions, and all pretrial discovery motions, and all motions that relate directly to these motions, such as motions for extension of time, motions for reconsideration, motions for sanctions, and motions for mental or physical examinations. Signed by Senior Judge James I. Cohn on 4/5/2021. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

#8

(#22) NOTICE by Burberry Limited, a New York Corporation, Burberry Limited, a United Kingdom company re #1 Complaint, #8 Sealed Order on Motion,, Order on Ex Parte Motion, #6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Order Restraining Transfer of Assets , #14 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION To Extend Temporary Restraining Order and Continue Hearing Scheduled for April 15, 2021 in Connection with Motion for Preliminary Injunction , #15 Order on Ex Parte Motion, #18 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #17 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, upon Defendants via Electronic Mail (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Sevice) (Gaffigan, Stephen) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#4

(#23) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Burberry Limited, a New York Corporation, Burberry Limited, a United Kingdom company re #7 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) , #1 Complaint, #12 Sealed Document, #8 Sealed Order on Motion,, Order on Ex Parte Motion, #6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Order Restraining Transfer of Assets , #14 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION To Extend Temporary Restraining Order and Continue Hearing Scheduled for April 15, 2021 in Connection with Motion for Preliminary Injunction , #4 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement, #16 Plaintiff's MOTION to Unseal , #19 Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es), #5 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4, #3 Form AO 120/121, #11 Sealed Order on Motion,, Order on Motion to Seal, #15 Order on Ex Parte Motion, #18 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #17 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, 2 Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment,, #10 Sealed Order, upon Defendants via website posting (Gaffigan, Stephen) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#3

(#23) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Burberry Limited, a New York Corporation, Burberry Limited, a United Kingdom company re #7 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) , #1 Complaint, #12 Sealed Document, #8 Sealed Order on Motion,, Order on Ex Parte Motion, #6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Order Restraining Transfer of Assets , #14 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION To Extend Temporary Restraining Order and Continue Hearing Scheduled for April 15, 2021 in Connection with Motion for Preliminary Injunction , #4 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement, #16 Plaintiff's MOTION to Unseal , #19 Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es), #5 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4, #3 Form AO 120/121, #11 Sealed Order on Motion,, Order on Motion to Seal, #15 Order on Ex Parte Motion, #18 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #17 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, 2 Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment,, #10 Sealed Order, upon Defendants via website posting (Gaffigan, Stephen) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re granted #6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Order Restraining Transfer of Assets filed by Burberry Limited, a New York Corporation, Burberry Limited, a United Kingdom company Signed by Senior Judge James I. Cohn on 4/29/2021. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge James I. Cohn: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 4/29/2021 re #6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Order Restraining Transfer of Assets filed by Burberry Limited, a New York Corporation, Burberry Limited, a United Kingdom company. Despite being given notice, no Defendants appeared. The Court found that Plaintiffs met their burden of showing that (1) they are substantially likely to succeed on the merits of their claims; (2) allowing Defendants to continue their unlawful conduct would irreparably harm Plaintiffs; (3) the balance of harms strongly favors Plaintiffs; and (4) halting Defendants conduct serves the public interest. The Court granted Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction and will enter a written order without delay. Total time in court: 10 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Christine Ann Daley. Court Reporter: Sharon Velazco, 305-523-5636 / Sharon_PellVelazco@flsd.uscourts.gov. (pjn) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE by Burberry Limited, a New York Corporation, Burberry Limited, a United Kingdom company of E-mail Inquiries Received from Certain Defendants in Connection with Asset Restraint and Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to the Notice of E-mail Inquiries) (Daley, Christine) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Exhibit List in Connection with Preliminary Injunction Hearing Scheduled for April 29, 2021 by Burberry Limited, a New York Corporation, Burberry Limited, a United Kingdom company.. (Daley, Christine) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Witness List in Connection with Preliminary Injunction Hearing Scheduled for April 29, 2021 by Burberry Limited, a New York Corporation, Burberry Limited, a United Kingdom company.. (Daley, Christine) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Burberry Limited, a New York Corporation, Burberry Limited, a United Kingdom company re #7 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) , #1 Complaint, #12 Sealed Document, #8 Sealed Order on Motion,, Order on Ex Parte Motion, #6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Order Restraining Transfer of Assets , #14 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION To Extend Temporary Restraining Order and Continue Hearing Scheduled for April 15, 2021 in Connection with Motion for Preliminary Injunction , #4 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement, #16 Plaintiff's MOTION to Unseal , #19 Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es), #5 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4, #3 Form AO 120/121, #11 Sealed Order on Motion,, Order on Motion to Seal, #15 Order on Ex Parte Motion, #18 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #17 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, 2 Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment,, #10 Sealed Order, upon Defendants via website posting (Gaffigan, Stephen) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE by Burberry Limited, a New York Corporation, Burberry Limited, a United Kingdom company re #1 Complaint, #8 Sealed Order on Motion,, Order on Ex Parte Motion, #6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Order Restraining Transfer of Assets , #14 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION To Extend Temporary Restraining Order and Continue Hearing Scheduled for April 15, 2021 in Connection with Motion for Preliminary Injunction , #15 Order on Ex Parte Motion, #18 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #17 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, upon Defendants via Electronic Mail (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Sevice) (Gaffigan, Stephen) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice, of Defendant Number 148 by Burberry Limited, a New York Corporation, Burberry Limited, a United Kingdom company (Daley, Christine) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (mee) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Burberry Limited, a New York Corporation, Burberry Limited, a United Kingdom company re #10 Sealed Order, (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Proposed Summons) (Daley, Christine) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 1/24/2022 at 09:00 AM before Senior Judge James I. Cohn. Calendar Call set for 1/20/2022 at 09:00 AM before Senior Judge James I. Cohn. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss to conduct a Scheduling Conference and for appropriate disposition of all pro hac vice motions, and all pretrial discovery motions, and all motions that relate directly to these motions, such as motions for extension of time, motions for reconsideration, motions for sanctions, and motions for mental or physical examinations. Signed by Senior Judge James I. Cohn on 4/5/2021. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Sealed Deadlines/Hearings per DE #8 Order: Responses due by 4/12/2021 Replies due by 4/14/2021. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 4/15/2021 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Senior Judge James I. Cohn. (amb) Modified to unseal on 4/15/2021 (amb). (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SEALED ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND SETTING HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re #6 Ex Parte Motion,,,,,,, filed by Burberry Limited, a New York Corporation, Burberry Limited, a United Kingdom company.; granting #6 Ex Parte Motion Signed by Senior Judge James I. Cohn on 4/5/2021. (amb) Modified to unseal on 4/15/2021 (amb). (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) by Burberry Limited, a New York Corporation, Burberry Limited, a United Kingdom company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christine Ann Daley in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Christine Ann Daley, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Motion for Alternate Service) (Daley, Christine) Modified to unseal on 4/15/2021 (amb). (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Order Restraining Transfer of Assets by Burberry Limited, a New York Corporation, Burberry Limited, a United Kingdom company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer Halter in Support of Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Declaration of Christine Ann Daley in Support of Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, #3 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Christine Ann Daley, #4 Declaration of Kathleen Burns in Support of Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, #5 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Kathleen Burns, Part 1 of 13, #6 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Kathleen Burns, Part 2 of 13, #7 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Kathleen Burns, Part 3 of 13, #8 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Kathleen Burns, Part 4 of 13, #9 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Kathleen Burns, Part 5 of 13, #10 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Kathleen Burns, Part 6 of 13, #11 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Kathleen Burns, Part 7 of 13, #12 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Kathleen Burns, Part 8 of 13, #13 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Kathleen Burns, Part 9 of 13, #14 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Kathleen Burns, Part 10 of 13, #15 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Kathleen Burns, Part 11 of 13, #16 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Kathleen Burns, Part 12 of 13, #17 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Kathleen Burns, Part 13 of 13, #18 Text of Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Application for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Setting Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction) (Daley, Christine) Modified to unseal on 4/15/2021 (amb). (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Burberry Limited, a New York Corporation, Burberry Limited, a United Kingdom company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal) (Daley, Christine) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Burberry Limited, a New York Corporation, Burberry Limited, a United Kingdom company identifying Corporate Parent Burberry Group plc for Burberry Limited, a New York Corporation, Burberry Limited, a United Kingdom company (Daley, Christine) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (cds) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James I. Cohn. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14573860, filed by Burberry Limited, a United Kingdom company, Burberry Limited, a New York Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Complaint)(Gaffigan, Stephen) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations is a litigant

Latest cases where Burberry Limited, a United Kingdom company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christine Ann Daley

Latest cases represented by Lawyer T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez