This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:56:14 (UTC).

Buraimoh v. BMW of North America, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Buraimoh filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW of North America, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert Pitman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00019

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert Pitman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roger Buraimoh

Defendant

BMW of North America, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sergei Lemberg

Attorney at Lemberg Law, LLC

43 Danbury Road

Wilton, CT 06897

Defendant Attorney

Merritt N. Spencer

Attorney at Clark Hill Strasburger

720 Brazos Street, Suite 700

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13038022). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Roger Buraimoh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#6

(#6) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rules 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6) by BMW of North America, LLC. (Spencer, Merritt) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Roger Buraimoh. (Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Parties by Roger Buraimoh. (Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to BMW of North America, LLC. (cj) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roger Buraimoh. BMW of North America, LLC served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020. (Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#7

(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against BMW of North America, LLC amending, filed by Roger Buraimoh.(Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order MOOTING #6 Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Robert Pitman. In light of Plaintiff's amended complaint, (Dkt. 7), Defendant's motion to dismiss, (Dkt. 6), is MOOT as it pertains to a now superseded pleading. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ld) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against BMW of North America, LLC amending, filed by Roger Buraimoh.(Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION REFERRED: referred #6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rules 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6). Referral Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (lt) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order REFERRING #6 Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, (Dkt. 6), is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Andrew Austin for a report and recommendation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1(d) of Appendix C of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ld) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rules 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6) by BMW of North America, LLC. (Spencer, Merritt) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roger Buraimoh. BMW of North America, LLC served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020. (Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to BMW of North America, LLC. (cj) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Roger Buraimoh. (cj) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Austin (cj) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Roger Buraimoh. (Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Parties by Roger Buraimoh. (Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13038022). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Roger Buraimoh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less