This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:06:32 (UTC).

BUNZEY v. THE HOME DEPOT, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 BUNZEY filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against THE HOME DEPOT, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN M. YOUNGE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-05742

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN M. YOUNGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JESSICA BUNZEY

Defendant

THE HOME DEPOT, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ARI RISSON KARPF

Attorney at KARPF, KARPF & CERUTTI, P.C.

3331 Street Road, Two Greenwood Square, Suite 128

Bensalem, PA 19020

JULIA W. CLARK

Attorney at KARPF, KARPF & CERUTTI P.C.

3331 Street Road, Suite 128, Two Greenwood Square

Bensalem, PA 19020

Defendant Attorneys

JACQUELINE R. BARRETT

Attorney at OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART PC

1735 Market St Ste 3000

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JOSHUA BRAND

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins

1735 Market Street, Suite 3000

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against THE HOME DEPOT, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13971289.), filed by JESSICA BUNZEY.(KARPF, ARI) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by JACQUELINE R. BARRETT on behalf of THE HOME DEPOT, INC. with Certificate of Service(BARRETT, JACQUELINE) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JESSICA BUNZEY. THE HOME DEPOT, INC. waiver sent on 12/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. (KARPF, ARI) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#8

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by JULIA W. CLARK on behalf of JESSICA BUNZEY (CLARK, JULIA) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA BRAND on behalf of THE HOME DEPOT, INC. with Certificate of Service(BRAND, JOSHUA) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER THAT A FED. R. CIV. P. 16 CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON WEDNESDAY, JANUARY 29TH, 2020, AT 10:00 A.M., IN CHAMBERS (ROOM 4007), UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PENNSYLVANIA. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: THE PARTIES SHALL MAKE THE REQUIRED INITIAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 26(A) WITHIN 14 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 1/2/20. 1/3/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED. (va, ) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#7

(#7) Discovery Plan by JESSICA BUNZEY.(CLARK, JULIA) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY MAY 28, 2020. ALL MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN JUNE 26, 2020. AT THE PARTIES REQUEST, THIS MATTER WILL BE REFERRED TO THE HONORABLE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS, UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, FOR SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON THURSDAY, NOVEMBER 19, 2020, AT 11:00 A.M. IN ROOM 4007. ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 1/29/20. 1/30/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(va, ) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY MAY 28, 2020. ALL MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN JUNE 26, 2020. AT THE PARTIES REQUEST, THIS MATTER WILL BE REFERRED TO THE HONORABLE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS, UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, FOR SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON THURSDAY, NOVEMBER 19, 2020, AT 11:00 A.M. IN ROOM 4007. ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 1/29/20. 1/30/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(va, ) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE. Initial Pretrial Conference held on 01/29/2020. (va, ) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Discovery Plan by JESSICA BUNZEY.(CLARK, JULIA) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA BRAND on behalf of THE HOME DEPOT, INC. with Certificate of Service(BRAND, JOSHUA) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by JACQUELINE R. BARRETT on behalf of THE HOME DEPOT, INC. with Certificate of Service(BARRETT, JACQUELINE) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by JULIA W. CLARK on behalf of JESSICA BUNZEY (CLARK, JULIA) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER THAT A FED. R. CIV. P. 16 CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON WEDNESDAY, JANUARY 29TH, 2020, AT 10:00 A.M., IN CHAMBERS (ROOM 4007), UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PENNSYLVANIA. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: THE PARTIES SHALL MAKE THE REQUIRED INITIAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 26(A) WITHIN 14 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 1/2/20. 1/3/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED. (va, ) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JESSICA BUNZEY. THE HOME DEPOT, INC. waiver sent on 12/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. (KARPF, ARI) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket(1) Summons Issued as to THE HOME DEPOT, INC.. Forwarded To: counsel on 12/9/19. (kw, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by PLFF JESSICA BUNZEY. (kw, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against THE HOME DEPOT, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13971289.), filed by JESSICA BUNZEY.(KARPF, ARI) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.