This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/07/2021 at 07:55:54 (UTC).

Bunning v. Zimmer, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Bunning filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Zimmer, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Philip A. Brimmer and Michael E. Hegarty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01876

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Philip A. Brimmer

Referral Judge

Michael E. Hegarty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cynthia J. Bunning

Defendants

Zimmer, Inc.

Zimmer US, Inc.

Zimmer Holdings, Inc.

Zimmer Orthopaedic Surgical Products, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

George E. McLaughlin

Attorney at McLaughlin Law Firm, P.C.

1890 Gaylord Street

Denver, CO 80206

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 19 July 2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/25/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 11/1/2021 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/12/2021. Text Only Entry (pabsec2) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No summons issued. (cpomm, ) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (cpomm, ) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer Orthopaedic Surgical Products, Inc., Zimmer US, Inc., Zimmer, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7952344)Attorney George E. McLaughlin added to party Cynthia J. Bunning(pty:pla), filed by Cynthia J. Bunning. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McLaughlin, George) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Zimmer Orthopaedic Surgical Products, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Zimmer Holdings Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Zimmer Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer George E. McLaughlin