This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/19/2021 at 10:22:04 (UTC).

Bunch v State of Illinois

Case Summary

On 11/20/2020 Bunch filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against State of Illinois. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sue E. Myerscough and Tom Schanzle-Haskins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-03310

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sue E. Myerscough

Referral Judge

Tom Schanzle-Haskins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ora J Bunch

Springfield, IL 62701

Defendants

Illinois Department of Financial and Professional Regulation

State of Illinois

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James P Baker

Attorney at BAKER BAKER & KRAJEWSKI LLC

415 S Seventh St

Springfield, IL 62701

Defendant Attorney

Joseph Dennis Bracey, Jr.

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

500 South Second Street

Springfield, IL 62701

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by State of Illinois.(Bracey, Joseph) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead #6 ALLOWED. Extension granted to 1/12/2021. (LB, ilcd) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant State of Illinois. Responses due by 1/5/2021 (Bracey, Joseph) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Joseph Dennis Bracey, Jr on behalf of State of Illinois (Bracey, Joseph) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Return of Service Executed by Ora J Bunch as to State of Illinois 12/1/2020. (Baker, James) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to State of Illinois. Original returned to Attorney James P. Baker to effectuate service. (GL, ilcd) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Ora J Bunch. (Baker, James) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT of Ora J. Bunch against Illinois Department of Financial and Professional Regulation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3528013.), filed by Ora J Bunch.(Baker, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (GL, ilcd). (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Illinois Department of Financial and Professional Regulation is a litigant