This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/07/2021 at 08:54:31 (UTC).

Bullock v. Providence Health and Services et al

Case Summary

On 12/09/2020 Bullock filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Providence Health and Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Salvador Mendoza, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00455

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Salvador Mendoza, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Bullock

Spokane, WA 99203

Defendants

Providence Sacred Heart Medical Center

Providence Health and Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas P Holt

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

600 University Street, Suite 3200

Seattle, WA 98101-3122

Birgitte Marie Gingold

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

600 University Street, Suite 3200

Seattle, WA 98101-3122

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) STATUS REPORT from Both Parties, submitted by Providence Health and Services, Providence Sacred Heart Medical Center. (Holt, Thomas) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(Holt, Thomas) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#2

(#2) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by All Defendants. (Holt, Thomas) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit 1-5

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $402; Receipt #0980-3640142 Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-5)(Holt, Thomas) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STATUS REPORT from Both Parties, submitted by Providence Health and Services, Providence Sacred Heart Medical Center. (Holt, Thomas) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/11/2021 at 08:30 AM via Teleconference before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail. (Attachments: #1 Consent to MJ Form)(TNC, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(Holt, Thomas) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by All Defendants. (Holt, Thomas) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Judge Assignment. Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr assigned to case. (CLP, Case Administrator) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $402; Receipt #0980-3640142 Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-5)(Holt, Thomas) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROVIDENCE SACRED HEART MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where Providence Health & Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas Patrick Holt