This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/05/2021 at 07:09:46 (UTC).

Buisson v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/06/2021 Buisson filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Uber Technologies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ann M Donnelly and Taryn A. Merkl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02534

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ann M Donnelly

Referral Judge

Taryn A. Merkl

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Melissa Buisson

Defendants

Uber USA, LLC

Uber Technologies, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bryan Barenbaum

Attorney at Law Offices of Bryan Barenbaum

2060 Eastern Parkway

Brooklyn, NY 11207

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher Gerard Betke

Attorney at Coughlin Betke LLP

175 Federal Street

Boston, MA 02111

Andrew Ross Ferguson

Attorney at Coughlin Betke LLP

175 Federal Street, Suite 1450

Boston, MA 02110

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) STATUS REPORT of the Parties re Order dated June 3, 2021 by Uber Technologies, Inc., Uber USA, LLC (Ferguson, Andrew) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#11

(#11) Proposed Scheduling Order -Rule 26(f) Meeting Report -CORRECTED by Melissa Buisson (Barenbaum, Bryan) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

#10

(#10) Proposed Scheduling Order -Rule 26(f) Meeting Report by Melissa Buisson (Barenbaum, Bryan) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#9

(#9) First MOTION for pre motion conference by Melissa Buisson. (Barenbaum, Bryan) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

#8

No Description Available

#7

No Description Available

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Ross Ferguson on behalf of Uber Technologies, Inc., Uber USA, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Ferguson, Andrew) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Uber Technologies, Inc., Uber USA, LLC. (Betke, Christopher) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal, by Uber Technologies, Inc., Uber USA, LLC (Betke, Christopher) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/7/2021) (Lee, Tiffeny). (Entered: 05/06/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B., Record

1 #1

Exhibit A., Hearing Transcript

#1

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal, by Uber Technologies, Inc., Uber USA, LLC (Betke, Christopher) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/7/2021) (Lee, Tiffeny). (Entered: 05/06/2021)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATUS REPORT ORDER re #13 : The parties shall file a Status Report on or before 8/10/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Taryn A. Merkl on 6/15/2021. (Cahn, Gabriel) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STATUS REPORT of the Parties re Order dated June 3, 2021 by Uber Technologies, Inc., Uber USA, LLC (Ferguson, Andrew) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Taryn A. Merkl. Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Mahoney, Brenna) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: The request at ECF No. #9 is granted. The Court held the initial conference in plaintiff's personal injury case on June 3, 2021. The parties shall file a joint status letter by June 11, 2021 stating whether plaintiff intends to move to remand this matter to state court and whether defendant intends to cross-move to compel arbitration. As discussed on the record, if the plaintiff intends to seek remand and defendant intends to cross-move to compel arbitration, the parties' letter shall include a proposed briefing schedule for the motions. Any proposed briefing schedule shall comply with Judge Donnelly's Individual Motion Practices and Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 6/3/2021. (Rein, Gilbert) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom: Telephone Conference held on 6/3/2021. (AT&T Log #10:39-11:06.) (Rein, Gilbert) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 First MOTION for pre motion conference filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Summons and Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit B. Preliminary Conference Order) (Ferguson, Andrew) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Proposed Scheduling Order -Rule 26(f) Meeting Report -CORRECTED by Melissa Buisson (Barenbaum, Bryan) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Proposed Scheduling Order -Rule 26(f) Meeting Report by Melissa Buisson (Barenbaum, Bryan) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court has received the plaintiff's #9 pre-motion conference request. The defendants must file a response by June 1, 2021, in accordance with my Individual Practices and Rules, 4(A). Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 5/26/2021. (Lawoyin, Feyilana) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) First MOTION for pre motion conference by Melissa Buisson. (Barenbaum, Bryan) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Ross Ferguson on behalf of Uber Technologies, Inc., Uber USA, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Ferguson, Andrew) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketORDER: Defendants removed this personal injury case from Kings County Supreme Court, invoking this court's diversity jurisdiction. ECF No. 1. The Court shall hold the initial conference by telephone in plaintiff's case on June 3, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. The parties shall call the Chambers telephone conference line at (888) 363-4734 and use the access code 4444221 promptly at 10:30 a.m. The parties shall exchange their Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures and file their Rule 26(f) Meeting Report with the Court by May 27, 2021. Any party seeking a trial by jury shall file a jury demand by May 21, 2021. Fed. R. Civ. P. 81(c)(3). Parties are advised that they must contact each other before making any request for an adjournment to the Court. Any request for an adjournment must be electronically filed with the Court at least seventy-two (72) hours before the scheduled conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 5/14/2021. (Wilhelm, Samantha) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Uber Technologies, Inc., Uber USA, LLC. (Betke, Christopher) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketThis case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal, by Uber Technologies, Inc., Uber USA, LLC (Betke, Christopher) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/7/2021) (Lee, Tiffeny). (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketNotice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet (MISSING SECOND PAGE FORM). All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Uber Technologies, Inc., Uber USA, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-14446396) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A., Hearing Transcript, #2 Exhibit B., Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Betke, Christopher) (Attachment 3 replaced on 5/7/2021) (Lee, Tiffeny). (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UBER USA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bryan Barenbaum