This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:32:20 (UTC).

BUGG v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 BUGG filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against JOHNSON JOHNSON. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lois H. Goodman and Freda L. Wolfson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00183

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lois H. Goodman

Presiding Judge

Freda L. Wolfson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TENESHA BUGG

Defendants

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

In Re

JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JASON ITKIN

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ

6009 Memorial Drive

Houston, TX 77007

Defendant Attorneys

SUSAN M. SHARKO

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

600 Campus

Florham Park, NJ 07932

SCOTT A. JAMES

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

600 Travis Street, Suite 3400

Houston, TX 77002-2926

KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

600 Travis Ste 3400

Houston, TX 77002

JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

10 Morristown Road

Gillette, NJ 07933

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (BRENNAN, JESSICA) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (SHARKO, SUSAN) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by TENESHA BUGG. JOHNSON & JOHNSON served on 1/15/2020, answer due 2/5/2020. (ITKIN, JASON) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (pth) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by TENESHA BUGG. JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. served on 1/15/2020, answer due 2/5/2020. (ITKIN, JASON) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10224328) with JURY DEMAND, filed by TENESHA BUGG.(ITKIN, JASON) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by TENESHA BUGG. JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. served on 1/15/2020, answer due 2/5/2020. (ITKIN, JASON) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by TENESHA BUGG. JOHNSON & JOHNSON served on 1/15/2020, answer due 2/5/2020. (ITKIN, JASON) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (BRENNAN, JESSICA) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (SHARKO, SUSAN) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketMember Case Direct File on 1/6/2020, for MDL 16-2738 Party JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION added. (pth) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (pth) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10224328) with JURY DEMAND, filed by TENESHA BUGG.(ITKIN, JASON) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.