This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/18/2019 at 08:22:24 (UTC).

Buford v. Buckman Laboratories, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 Buford filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Buckman Laboratories, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tu M. Pham and Jon Phipps McCalla. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02635

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tu M. Pham

Presiding Judge

Jon Phipps McCalla

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carlton R Buford

Defendant

Buckman Laboratories, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kathleen L. Caldwell

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF KATHLEEN L. CALDWELL

Lipscomb & Pitts Building, 2670 Union Extended, Suite 110

Memphis, TN 38112

Defendant Attorneys

Lisa A. Krupicka

Attorney at BURCH PORTER & JOHNSON

130 N. Court Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103-2217

Gary Scott Peeples

Attorney at Burch, Porter & Johnson, PLLC

130 North Court Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103

 

Court Documents

#20

#19

#18

#16

#15

#14

#13

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#2

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Right to Sue

1 #1

Exhibit Charge of Discrimination

#1

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Buckman Laboratories, Inc.. (Krupicka, Lisa) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 11/8/19. (aac) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) SETTING LETTER: The Jury Trial is set for Monday, 10/19/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. The Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 10/9/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 PM on 10/2/2020. (jrs) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • (#17) Minute Entryfor proceedings held before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 11/4/2019. Kathleen L. Caldwell appeared for the Plaintiff. Lisa A. Krupicka and Gary Scott Peeples appeared for the Defendant. Case reviewed and schedule set. Jury Trial is set for Monday, 10/19/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 10/9/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 PM on 10/2/2020. Scheduling order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Candace Covey) (jrs) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) SETTING LETTER: The Telephonic Scheduling Conference is RESET to Monday, 11/4/2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Please follow the calling instructions on the attached Notice of Setting to access the conference. (jrs) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER granting #14 Motion to Reset Conference. Conference is reset to November 4, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 10/30/19. (aac) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION Reset Scheduling Conference Proposed Order Submitted by Carlton R Buford. (Caldwell, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Buckman Laboratories, Inc..(Krupicka, Lisa) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Thursday, 10/31/2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. *Please follow the calling instructions on the attached Notice of Setting.*(jrs) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Answer or other responsive pleading due 10/25/2019. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 10/3/2019. (aac) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer - Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum in Support (Proposed Order Submitted) by Buckman Laboratories, Inc.. (Peeples, Gary) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Scott Peeples on behalf of All Defendants (Peeples, Gary) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa A. Krupicka on behalf of All Defendants (Krupicka, Lisa) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlton R Buford. Buckman Laboratories, Inc. served on 9/20/2019, answer due 11/19/2019. (Caldwell, Kathleen) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Buckman Laboratories, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • (#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • (#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jae) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Buckman Laboratories, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3170916), filed by Carlton R Buford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit Right to Sue, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Caldwell, Kathleen) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Buckman Laboratories, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lisa A. Krupicka

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gary Scott Peeples