This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:23:50 (UTC).

Bufford v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Bufford filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner, Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Justin S. Anand and Mark H. Cohen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05503

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Justin S. Anand

Presiding Judge

Mark H. Cohen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Troy D. Bufford

Troy Bufford

Defendant

Commissioner, Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pamela Ilene Atkins

Attorney at Atkins & Associates, LLC

1124 Canton Street

Roswell, GA 30075

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. This action shall proceed as any other civil action, and Plaintiff shall be allowed to proceed without prepayment of a filing fee. Cunsel for Plaintiff is appointed to effect service of process upon Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 12/9/2019. (dob) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#6

RESTRICTED

7 #1

Completed PDF

#5

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) Electronic Summons Issued as to US Attorney. (dob) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/10/2019: #1 Completed PDF) (dob). (Entered: 12/10/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Return of Service Executed by Troy Bufford. Social Security Regional Chief Counsel served on 12/30/2019, answer due 4/8/2020. (Atkins, Pamela) Modified on 1/6/2020 to edit applicable party (dob). (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Electronic Summons Issued as to US Attorney. (dob) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/10/2019: #1 Completed PDF) (dob). (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Electronic Summons Issued as to US Attorney General. (dob) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Electronic Summons Issued as to Office of the Regional Chief Counsel. (dob) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to General Counsel. (dob) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT filed by Troy Bufford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dob) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 12/11/2019 to correct docket text (jap). (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. This action shall proceed as any other civil action, and Plaintiff shall be allowed to proceed without prepayment of a filing fee. Cunsel for Plaintiff is appointed to effect service of process upon Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 12/9/2019. (dob) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand for review. (jap) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Troy Bufford. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit to Complaint - EAJA Assignment, #3 IFP Motion and Proposed Order, #4 IFP Affidavit, #5 Summons Proposed AUSA ND GA, #6 Summons Proposed Region IV OGC, #7 Summons Proposed US Atty Gen, #8 Summons Proposed Gen Counsel SSA, #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (jap) Modified on 12/11/2019 to correct docket text (jap). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.