This case was last updated from PACER on 10/17/2020 at 10:19:46 (UTC).

Buffington v. Ovintiv USA Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 Buffington filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Ovintiv USA Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Scott T. Varholak and Raymond P. Moore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02477

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Scott T. Varholak

Presiding Judge

Raymond P. Moore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Morgan Buffington

Defendants

Ovintiv USA Inc.

Newfield Exploration Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Andrew Josephson

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap LLP

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Andrew Wells Dunlap

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap LLP

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

William R. Liles

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap LLP

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew Allen Yeh

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP-Houston

1301 Mckinney Street, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77010-3095

Michael Carter Crow

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP-Houston

1301 Mckinney Street, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77010-3095

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Morgan Buffington. (Liles, William) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew Allen Yeh on behalf of Newfield Exploration Company, Ovintiv USA Inc.Attorney Andrew Allen Yeh added to party Newfield Exploration Company(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Allen Yeh added to party Ovintiv USA Inc.(pty:dft) (Yeh, Andrew) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#11

(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Ovintiv Inc. for Newfield Exploration Company, Ovintiv USA Inc.. (Crow, Michael) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#10

(#10) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Newfield Exploration Company, Ovintiv USA Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Crow, Michael) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William R. Liles on behalf of Morgan BuffingtonAttorney William R. Liles added to party Morgan Buffington(pty:pla) (Liles, William) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew Wells Dunlap on behalf of Morgan BuffingtonAttorney Andrew Wells Dunlap added to party Morgan Buffington(pty:pla) (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Michael Carter Crow added to party Newfield Exploration Company(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Carter Crow added to party Ovintiv USA Inc.(pty:dft) by Newfield Exploration Company, Ovintiv USA Inc..(Crow, Michael) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Filing Notice of Consent by Plaintiff Morgan Buffington (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Filing Notice of Consents by Plaintiff Morgan Buffington (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 10/22/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 10/8/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/15/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/18/2020. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

3 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, ) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Ex B - Consent

1 #1

Exhibit Ex A - Consent

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Newfield Exploration Company, Ovintiv USA Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7442692)Attorney Michael Andrew Josephson added to party Morgan Buffington(pty:pla), filed by Morgan Buffington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Consent, #2 Exhibit Ex B - Consent, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Morgan Buffington. (Liles, William) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • Docket(#16) MINUTE ORDER The parties shall participate in the Scheduling Conference set for 10/22/2020 10:30 AM TELEPHONICALLY by calling 888.808.6929 at the scheduled time and utilizing access code: 2805116#. The Court notes that the parties may hear the conclusion of a prior hearing at the time they call in, and are instructed to simply wait until their case is called. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 10/09/2020. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, ) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • Docket(#15) MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/8/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • Docket(#14) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/8/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #10 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02477-RM. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, ) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew Allen Yeh on behalf of Newfield Exploration Company, Ovintiv USA Inc.Attorney Andrew Allen Yeh added to party Newfield Exploration Company(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Allen Yeh added to party Ovintiv USA Inc.(pty:dft) (Yeh, Andrew) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Ovintiv Inc. for Newfield Exploration Company, Ovintiv USA Inc.. (Crow, Michael) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Newfield Exploration Company, Ovintiv USA Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Crow, Michael) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William R. Liles on behalf of Morgan BuffingtonAttorney William R. Liles added to party Morgan Buffington(pty:pla) (Liles, William) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew Wells Dunlap on behalf of Morgan BuffingtonAttorney Andrew Wells Dunlap added to party Morgan Buffington(pty:pla) (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Michael Carter Crow added to party Newfield Exploration Company(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Carter Crow added to party Ovintiv USA Inc.(pty:dft) by Newfield Exploration Company, Ovintiv USA Inc..(Crow, Michael) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Filing Notice of Consent by Plaintiff Morgan Buffington (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Filing Notice of Consents by Plaintiff Morgan Buffington (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 10/22/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 10/8/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/15/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/18/2020. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, ) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (cpomm, ) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Newfield Exploration Company, Ovintiv USA Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7442692)Attorney Michael Andrew Josephson added to party Morgan Buffington(pty:pla), filed by Morgan Buffington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Consent, #2 Exhibit Ex B - Consent, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less