This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/12/2021 at 09:37:48 (UTC).

Buffalo Patents, LLC v. OnePlus Technology (Shenzen) Co., Ltd.

Case Summary

On October 13, 2021, Buffalo Patents, LLC (“Buffalo Patents” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Zachariah Harrington of Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against OnePlus Technology (Shenzen) Co., Ltd. (“OnePlus” or “Defendant”), seeking permanent injunctive relief, damages, costs, pre-judgment and post-judgment interest and other relief for the alleged infringement of the United States Patents owned by Plaintiff. This case was filed in the United States District Court in the Western District of Texas.

This complaint arises from Defendants’ alleged unlawful infringement of the United States patent owned by Plaintiff which relates to internet and wireless network telephony: United States Patent Nos. 7,187,670 (“the ’670 Patent”), United States Patent No. 7,408,915 (“the ’915 Patent”), United States Patent No. 8,611,328 (“the ’328 Patent”), United States Patent No. 9,001,816 (“the ’816 Patent”) (collectively, “Patents-in-suit”).

In the complaint, Plaintiff alleged that, “OnePlus made, had made, used, imported, provided, supplied, distributed, sold, and/or offered for sale products and/or systems including, for example, its OnePlus 8 smartphone and other products that support Voice over Wi-Fi (VoWi-Fi) or Wi-Fi calling (“accused products”). By doing so, OnePlus has directly infringed (literally and/or under the doctrine of equivalents) at least Claim 1 of the ’670 Patent. OnePlus’s infringement in this regard is ongoing.”

Plaintiff also alleged that, “OnePlus has induced the end users and/or OnePlus’s customers to directly infringe (literally and/or under the doctrine of equivalents) the ’670 Patent by using the accused products. OnePlus took active steps, directly and/or through contractual relationships with others, with the specific intent to cause them to use the accused products in a manner that infringes one or more claims of the ’670 Patent, including, for example, Claim 1 of the ’670 Patent.”

Further, Plaintiff alleged that, “Such steps by OnePlus included, among other things, advising or directing customers, end users, and others (including third party testing and certification organizations) to use the accused products in an infringing manner; advertising and promoting the use of the accused products in an infringing manner; and/or distributing instructions that guide users to use the accused products in an infringing manner. OnePlus performed these steps, which constitute joint and/or induced infringement, with the knowledge of the ’670 Patent and with the knowledge that the induced acts constitute infringement. OnePlus was and is aware that the normal and customary use of the accused products by OnePlus’s customers would infringe the ’670 Patent. OnePlus’s inducement is ongoing.”

There are four claims for relief laid down by Plaintiff; one for infringement of each of the Patents-in-suit.

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiff has requested the court to pass a judgment in favor of Plaintiff that Defendant has infringed, either literally and/or under the doctrine of equivalents, the Patents-in-suit along with an award of permanent injunctive relief, and damages including an award of all increased damages to which Buffalo Patents is entitled under 35 U.S.C. § 284. Plaintiff further requested the court for costs, expenses, and prejudgment and post-judgment interest. Further, the Plaintiff requested the court for a judgment and order finding this is an exceptional case within the meaning of 35 U.S.C. § 285 and attorneys’ fees and costs and further relief as the court may deem just and proper. 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-01063

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Buffalo Patents, LLC

Defendant

OnePlus Technology (Shenzen) Co., Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Zachariah Harrington

Attorney at Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP

4306 Yoakum Blvd., Suite 450

Houston, TX 77006

C. Ryan Pinckney

Attorney at Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP

4306 Yoakum Blvd., Suite 450

Houston, TX 77006

Larry D. Thompson

Attorney at Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP

4306 Yoakum Blvd., Suite 450

Houston, TX 77006

Rehan M. Safiullah

Attorney at Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP

4306 Yoakum Blvd. - Suite 450

Houston, TX 77006

Matthew Antonelli

Attorney at Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP

4306 Yoakum Blvd., Suite 450

Houston, TX 77006

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Buffalo Patents, LLC. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to OnePlus Technology (Shenzen) Co., Ltd. (ir) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Larry D. Thompson on behalf of Buffalo Patents, LLC (Thompson, Larry) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Antonelli on behalf of Buffalo Patents, LLC (Antonelli, Matthew) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rehan M. Safiullah on behalf of Buffalo Patents, LLC (Safiullah, Rehan) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Related Cases by Buffalo Patents, LLC (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Buffalo Patents, LLC. OnePlus Technology (Shenzen) Co., Ltd. served on 10/15/2021, answer due 11/5/2021. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#10

(#10) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Buffalo Patents, LLC. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#11

(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Buffalo Patents, LLC as to OnePlus Technology (Shenzen) Co., Ltd.. Waiver sent on 11/4/2021, answer due 2/2/2022. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Buffalo Patents, LLC as to OnePlus Technology (Shenzen) Co., Ltd.. Waiver sent on 11/4/2021, answer due 2/2/2022. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Buffalo Patents, LLC. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Buffalo Patents, LLC. OnePlus Technology (Shenzen) Co., Ltd. served on 10/15/2021, answer due 11/5/2021. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Related Cases by Buffalo Patents, LLC (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rehan M. Safiullah on behalf of Buffalo Patents, LLC (Safiullah, Rehan) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Antonelli on behalf of Buffalo Patents, LLC (Antonelli, Matthew) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Larry D. Thompson on behalf of Buffalo Patents, LLC (Thompson, Larry) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to OnePlus Technology (Shenzen) Co., Ltd. (ir) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Buffalo Patents, LLC. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15329074). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Buffalo Patents, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harrington, Zachariah) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Buffalo Patents, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where OnePlus Technology (Shenzhen) Co Ltd is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rehan Safiullah

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew J Antonelli