This case was last updated from PACER on 03/18/2021 at 07:41:53 (UTC).

Buentello v. Boebert

Case Summary

On 01/17/2021 Buentello filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Boebert. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Daniel D. Domenico. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00147

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel D. Domenico

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bri Buentello

Defendants

Lauren Boebert

Lauren (I) Boebert

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew Joseph McNulty

Attorney at Killmer Lane & Newman LLP

1543 Champa Street, Suite 400

Denver, CO 80202

David A. Lane

Attorney at Killmer Lane & Newman LLP

1543 Champa Street, Suite 400

Denver, CO 80202

Defendant Attorneys

Douglas N. Letter

Attorney at U.S. House of Representatives-OGC

5140 Oneill House Office Building

Washington, DC 20515

Todd B. Tatelman

Attorney at U.S. House of Representatives-OGC

5140 Oneill House Office Building

Washington, DC 20515

Brooks M. Hanner

Attorney at Office of General Counsel-U.S. House of Representitives

Oneill House Office Building, Room 5140

Washington, DC 20515

Suzanne M. Staiert

Attorney at Maven law Group

1800 Glenarm Place, Suite 950

Denver, CO 80202

George Herbert Brauchler, Jr.

Attorney at Maven law Group

1800 Glenarm Place, Suite 950

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

25 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

#25

(#25) Joint MOTION for Order to Establish Briefing Schedule and Exceed Word Limitations by Defendant Lauren Boebert. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Letter, Douglas) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Todd B. Tatelman on behalf of Lauren BoebertAttorney Todd B. Tatelman added to party Lauren Boebert(pty:dft) (Tatelman, Todd) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brooks M. Hanner on behalf of Lauren BoebertAttorney Brooks M. Hanner added to party Lauren Boebert(pty:dft) (Hanner, Brooks) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Douglas N. Letter on behalf of Lauren BoebertAttorney Douglas N. Letter added to party Lauren Boebert(pty:dft) (Letter, Douglas) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

#17

(#17) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bri Buentello. Lauren Boebert served on 2/11/2021, answer due 3/4/2021; Lauren (I) Boebert served on 2/11/2021, answer due 3/4/2021. (Lane, David) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

15 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

#14

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#5

(#5) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (jtorr, ) Modified to correct file date on 1/19/2021 (jtorr, ). (Entered: 01/19/2021)

2 #1

Exhibit

#2

(#9) MINUTE ORDER re: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Bri Buentello. Plaintiff seeks to enjoin Defendant, but it appears Plaintiff has not yet effected service of process on her. Once Plaintiff provides proof of service or once Defendant makes an appearance in this case, the court will set a briefing schedule on Plaintiff's motion. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 1/26/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, ) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER granting #25 Motion for Briefing Schedule. The court adopts the parties' proposed briefing schedule and word limitations on briefs. Defendant's response to the preliminary injunction motion shall be filed on or before March 30, 2021. That response shall not exceed 9,000 words. Plaintiff's reply shall be filed on or before April 9, 2021. That reply shall not exceed 4,400 words. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 3/9/2021. Text Only Entry(dddlc3, ) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Joint MOTION for Order to Establish Briefing Schedule and Exceed Word Limitations by Defendant Lauren Boebert. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Letter, Douglas) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • Docket(#24) Party Lauren (I) Boebert terminated in her individual capacity pursuant to the 23 Order filed in this case on 03/08/2021. Text Only Entry (athom, ) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER re: #18 Notice of Dismissal of Party filed by Bri Buentello. Pursuant to Plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal, the claims against Defendant Lauren Boebert in her individual capacity are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the individual capacity claims only. by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 3/8/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, ) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Todd B. Tatelman on behalf of Lauren BoebertAttorney Todd B. Tatelman added to party Lauren Boebert(pty:dft) (Tatelman, Todd) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brooks M. Hanner on behalf of Lauren BoebertAttorney Brooks M. Hanner added to party Lauren Boebert(pty:dft) (Hanner, Brooks) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Douglas N. Letter on behalf of Lauren BoebertAttorney Douglas N. Letter added to party Lauren Boebert(pty:dft) (Letter, Douglas) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bri Buentello. Lauren Boebert served on 2/22/2021, answer due 3/15/2021; Lauren (I) Boebert served on 2/22/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. (McNulty, Andrew) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party Lauren Boebert in her individual capacity by Plaintiff Bri Buentello (McNulty, Andrew) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bri Buentello. Lauren Boebert served on 2/11/2021, answer due 3/4/2021; Lauren (I) Boebert served on 2/11/2021, answer due 3/4/2021. (Lane, David) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bri Buentello. Lauren Boebert served on 1/22/2021, answer due 2/12/2021; Lauren (I) Boebert served on 1/22/2021, answer due 2/12/2021. (McNulty, Andrew) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE ORDER re: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Bri Buentello. Plaintiff seeks to enjoin Defendant, but it appears Plaintiff has not yet effected service of process on her. Once Plaintiff provides proof of service or once Defendant makes an appearance in this case, the court will set a briefing schedule on Plaintiff's motion. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 1/26/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, ) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (athom, ) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David A. Lane on behalf of Bri BuentelloAttorney David A. Lane added to party Bri Buentello(pty:pla) (Lane, David) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Lauren Boebert re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Bri Buentello. (McNulty, Andrew) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (jtorr, ) Modified to correct file date on 1/19/2021 (jtorr, ). (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) Modified to correct file date on 1/19/2021 (jtorr, ). (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • Docket(#3) Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (alave, ) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Bri Buentello. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(McNulty, Andrew) (Entered: 01/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Lauren Boebert (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7674656)Attorney Andrew Joseph McNulty added to party Bri Buentello(pty:pla), filed by Bri Buentello. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McNulty, Andrew) (Entered: 01/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brooks M. Hanner

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Todd Barry Tatelman Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Douglas Neal Letter Esq.