Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/09/2021 at 07:55:30 (UTC).

Buell v. Verizon Wireless Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 Buell filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Verizon Wireless Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael J. McShane. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00525

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael J. McShane

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Emerald Buell

Defendants

Cellco Partnership

Verizon Wireless Services, LLC doing business as Verizon Wireless

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Larry L. Linder

Attorney at Law Office of Larry L. Linder

3000 Market St. Plaza Ne, Ste. 150

Salem, OR 97301

Defendant Attorneys

Kira J. Johal

Attorney at Jackson Lewis PC

520 Pike Street, Suite 2300

Seattle, WA 98101

Barry Alan Johnsrud

Attorney at Jackson Lewis, LLP

520 Pike Street, Suite 2300

Seattle, WA 98101

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 8/6/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/7/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 9/7/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (jw) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Defendants. (Johnsrud, Barry) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

2 #2

Exhibit 2

2 #1

Exhibit 1

#2

(#2) Declaration of Barry Alan Johnsrud . Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Johnsrud, Barry) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Complaint

#1

(#1) Notice of Removal of Case Number 21CV04659 from Marion County. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: BORDC-8030226. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Wireless Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Johnsrud, Barry) Modified on 4/8/2021 to add payment information. (eo) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 8/6/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/7/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 9/7/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (jw) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Defendants. (Johnsrud, Barry) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Declaration of Barry Alan Johnsrud . Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Johnsrud, Barry) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal of Case Number 21CV04659 from Marion County. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: BORDC-8030226. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Wireless Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Johnsrud, Barry) Modified on 4/8/2021 to add payment information. (eo) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VERIZON WIRELESS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Larry L. Linder