This case was last updated from PACER on 10/13/2019 at 07:41:38 (UTC).

Bueb et al v. Sayre

Case Summary

On 08/14/2019 Bueb filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Sayre. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is William G. Young. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01784

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Puerto Rico District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William G. Young

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sandor Meijn

Emmanuel Bueb

Defendant

Michael David Sayre

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Monica Rivera-Pagan

P.O. Box 9006

San Juan, PR 00908

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time until October 14, 2019 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint filed by Michael David Sayre, Pro se. Responses due by 10/1/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (gav) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

3 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Michael David Sayre (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

1 #3

Category Sheet

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6542063.), filed by Emmanuel Bueb, Sandor Meijn. Service due by 11/12/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Category Sheet)(Rivera-Pagan, Monica) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Extension of Time until October 14, 2019 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint filed by Michael David Sayre, Pro se. Responses due by 10/1/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (gav) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Michael David Sayre (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • (#2) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6542063.), filed by Emmanuel Bueb, Sandor Meijn. Service due by 11/12/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Category Sheet)(Rivera-Pagan, Monica) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.