This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/15/2022 at 08:10:09 (UTC).

Budrow v. JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association (NA) et al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 Budrow filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association NA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Stearns. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-10052

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Stearns

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jean Shea Budrow

Revere, MA 02151

Defendants

JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association (NA)

Chase Home Finance LLC

Caliber Home Loans, Inc.

U.S. Bank Trust, NA

Shellpoint Mortgaging Servicing

NewRez, LLC doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing

Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC

Not Classified By Court and Defendant

Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jean S. Budrow

Attorney at JEANSHEALAW

209 Rice Avenue

Revere, MA 02151

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 1 Note & Mortgage

1 #3

Exhibit 2 Assignment of Mortgage

1 #4

Exhibit 3 Foreclosure Court Papers

1 #5

Exhibit 4 M.G.L.c. 93A Letters

1 #6

Exhibit 5 Pay History

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Caliber Home Loans, Inc., Chase Home Finance LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association (NA), Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC, NewRez, LLC, Shellpoint Mortgaging Servicing, U.S. Bank Trust, NA. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (de Oliveira, Flaviana) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#5

(#5) Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by Jean Shea Budrow. (Budrow, Jean) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Jean Shea Budrow. Chase Home Finance LLC served on 2/23/2022, answer due 3/16/2022. (Pacho, Arnold) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Jean Shea Budrow. Chase Home Finance LLC served on 2/23/2022, answer due 3/16/2022. (Pacho, Arnold) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by Jean Shea Budrow. (Budrow, Jean) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Caliber Home Loans, Inc., Chase Home Finance LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association (NA), Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings, LLC, NewRez, LLC, Shellpoint Mortgaging Servicing, U.S. Bank Trust, NA. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (de Oliveira, Flaviana) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format both a Local Category Form & a Civil Cover Sheet. Both forms can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents - Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet. https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/resources/forms-local.htm(de Oliveira, Flaviana) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against all defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9138075 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Jean Shea Budrow. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 Note & Mortgage, #3 Exhibit 2 Assignment of Mortgage, #4 Exhibit 3 Foreclosure Court Papers, #5 Exhibit 4 M.G.L.c. 93A Letters, #6 Exhibit 5 Pay History)(Budrow, Jean). (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chase Home Finance LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Morgan Stanley Delta Holdings, LLC dba Morgan Stanley Private Bank, National Association is a litigant

Latest cases where Newrez, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant