This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/22/2020 at 09:09:19 (UTC).

Budo Trading LLC v. J.P. Morgan Chase & Co. et al

Case Summary

On 07/24/2020 Budo Trading LLC filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against J P Morgan Chase Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul A. Engelmayer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-05772

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul A. Engelmayer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Budo Trading LLC

Petitioners

Synova Asset Management, LLC

Charles Herbert Proctor, III

Defendants

J.P. Morgan Chase & Co.

J.P. Morgan Futures, Inc.

J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp.

J.P. Morgan Securities LLC

John Does

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher M. Burke

Attorney at Scott+Scott Attorneys at Law LLP

600 W. Broadway, Suite 3300

San Diego, CA 92101

Brian M. Hogan

Attorney at Freed Kanner London Millen LLC

2201 Waukegan Rd, Suite 130

Bannockburn, IL 60015

Douglas A. Millen

Attorney at Freed Kanner London & Millen LLC

2201 Waukegan Road, Suite 130

Bannockburn, IL 60015

Thomas Kay Boardman

Attorney at Scott + Scott, L.L.P.( NYC)

230 Park Avenue, 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10169

Petitioner Attorney

Karen M. Lerner

Attorney at Kirby McInerney LLP

250 Park Avenue, Suite 820

New York, NY 10177

Defendant Attorneys

Amanda Flug Davidoff

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell LLP (DC)

1700 New York Avenue, N.W., Suite 700

Washington, DC 20006

Robert Andrew Sacks

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell LLP (Los Angeles)

1888 Century Park East, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Akash Mayank Toprani

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP (NYC)

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

 

Court Documents

#29

#28

#27

RESTRICTED

#26

#25

24 #6

Exhibit F - WSJ Article

24 #5

Exhibit E - Endeavor LLC

24 #4

Exhibit D - Breakwater LLC

24 #2

Exhibit B - Kirby Resume

24 #1

Exhibit A - Lowey Resume

#24

#22

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: #22 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Lowey Dannenberg P.C. and Kirby McInerney LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Consolidate Related Cases. . Document filed by Charles Herbert Proctor, III, Synova Asset Management, LLC..(Lerner, Karen) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 8/13/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERNECE held on 8/13/2020 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/24/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/5/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2020..(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #25 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #22 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Lowey Dannenberg P.C. and Kirby McInerney LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Consolidate Related Cases. . Document filed by Budo Trading LLC..(Millen, Douglas) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Charles Herbert Proctor, III, Synova Asset Management, LLC. Related Document Number: #22 ..(Lerner, Karen) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) DECLARATION of Karen M. Lerner in Support re: #22 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Lowey Dannenberg P.C. and Kirby McInerney LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Consolidate Related Cases.. Document filed by Charles Herbert Proctor, III, Synova Asset Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lowey Resume, #2 Exhibit B - Kirby Resume, #3 Exhibit C - Billing and Expense Protocol, #4 Exhibit D - Breakwater LLC, #5 Exhibit E - Endeavor LLC, #6 Exhibit F - WSJ Article).(Lerner, Karen) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #22 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Lowey Dannenberg P.C. and Kirby McInerney LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Consolidate Related Cases. . Document filed by Charles Herbert Proctor, III, Synova Asset Management, LLC..(Lerner, Karen) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Lowey Dannenberg P.C. and Kirby McInerney LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Consolidate Related Cases. Document filed by Charles Herbert Proctor, III, Synova Asset Management, LLC..(Lerner, Karen) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [25 in 1:20-cv-03515-PAE et al] Letter. ENDORSEMENT; The Court adopts the proposed schedule and sets September 4, 2020 as the due date for any responses to motions to consolidate or motions to appoint lead counsel. (Motions due by 8/21/2020. Responses due by 9/4/2020) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/13/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp., J.P. Morgan Futures, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC..(pc) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Engelmayer as possibly related to 20cv5298. (pc) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Christopher M. Burke re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF;. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (pc) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Futures, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Budo Trading LLC..(Burke, Christopher) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:20-cv-5298-PAE. Document filed by Budo Trading LLC..(Burke, Christopher) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Budo Trading LLC..(Burke, Christopher) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Burke, Christopher) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp., J.P. Morgan Futures, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-20839021)Document filed by Budo Trading LLC..(Burke, Christopher) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where J.P. Morgan Futures, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant