This case was last updated from PACER on 01/10/2020 at 07:51:44 (UTC).

Buckner v. Saul

Case Summary

On 11/11/2019 Buckner filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William T. Moore, Jr and Christopher L. Ray. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00302

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William T. Moore, Jr

Referral Judge

Christopher L. Ray

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark Anthony Buckner

Defendant

Commissioner Andrew Saul

Not Classified By Court

Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mario Anthony Pacella

Attorney at Strom Law Firm, LLC

P.O. Box 1635

Brunswick, GA 31521

Defendant Attorney

Jason W. Blanchard

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office - Augusta

P.O. Box 2017

Augusta, GA 30903

 

Court Documents

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

4 #1

Corrected Summons

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul c/o Attorney General of the U.S. DOJ. (loh) Modified on 11/12/2019 (loh). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/12/2019: #1 Corrected Summons) (loh). (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#3

(#3) GENERAL ORDER FOR SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 11/12/19. (loh) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Anthony Buckner. Andrew Saul served on 11/18/2019, answer due 2/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service as to SSA)(Pacella, Mario) Modified on 12/4/2019 (loh). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason W. Blanchard on behalf of Andrew Saul (Blanchard, Jason) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul c/o Attorney General of U.S. DOJ. (loh) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul c/o Attorney General of the U.S. DOJ. (loh) Modified on 11/12/2019 (loh). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/12/2019: #1 Corrected Summons) (loh). (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (loh) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) GENERAL ORDER FOR SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 11/12/19. (loh) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security & Bobby Christine, United States Attorney. (loh) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Mark Anthony Buckner. Receipt # 113J-2721917. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(loh) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less