This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/13/2021 at 12:20:06 (UTC).

Buckman Laboratories, Inc. v. Weatherman et al

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 Buckman Laboratories, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Weatherman. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charmiane G. Claxton and Jon Phipps McCalla. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02026

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charmiane G. Claxton

Presiding Judge

Jon Phipps McCalla

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Buckman Laboratories, Inc.

Defendants

Solenis L.L.C.

J. David Weatherman

Daniel E. Imler

Not Classified By Court

Clerk W. Aaron Hall

Memphis, TN 38103

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brett A. Hughes

Attorney at HARRIS SHELTON HANOVER WALSH, PLLC - East Memphis

6060 Primacy Parkway, Suite 100

Memphis, TN 38119

Emily Hamm Huseth

Attorney at HARRIS SHELTON HANOVER WALSH, PLLC - East Memphis

6060 Primacy Parkway, Suite 100

Memphis, TN 38119

Defendant Attorney

Clarence A. Wilbon

Attorney at ADAMS AND REESE, LLP

6075 Poplar Avenue, Suite 700

Memphis, TN 38119

 

Court Documents

#24

#23

21 #2

Exhibit

21 #1

Memorandum

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#15

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) AMENDED COMPLAINT against J. David Weatherman, Daniel E. Imler and Solenis L.L.C., filed by Buckman Laboratories, Inc..(Hughes, Brett) Modified on 3/11/2021 docket text per Helpdesk e-mail (cdi). (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER GRANTING #21 PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 3/10/2021. (joj) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #21 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Buckman Laboratories, Inc. has been filed. For future reference, please note : Filer failed to indicate in docket text "Proposed Order Submitted" as required by local rules. If no order previously emailed to chambers, please do so upon receipt of this notice. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Buckman Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit)(Hughes, Brett) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE by Solenis L.L.C., J. David Weatherman Notice of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Wilbon, Clarence) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 2/22/2021. (joj) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 2/16/2021. (joj) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SETTING LETTER: A Jury Trial is set for Monday, 3/21/2022 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. A Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 3/11/2022 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. A Proposed Joint Pretrial Order will be due by 4:30 PM on 3/2/2022. (jrs) Modified on 2/10/2021 - typo correction (jrs). (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 2/10/2021. Emily Hamm Huseth and Brett Hughes appeared for the Plaintiff. Clarence Wilbon appeared for the Defendant. The breach of contract case was removed from Shelby County Chancery Court on 1/12/2021. A Telephonic Status Conference was held on Wednesday, 1/20/2021. The Court entered a Protective Order on 1/28/2021 #15 . Parties advised the Court that discussions toward possible resolution continue. Case history, nature of the case, and background information reviewed. Defendants affirmative defenses briefly reviewed. Additional parties are expected to join with a deadline of 4/3/2021. Experts are not anticipated. Dispositive motions are not anticipated. Court set the schedule with remaining dates and deadlines. The Jury Trial is set for Monday, 3/21/2022 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. The trial is expected to take 3 days. The Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 3/11/2022 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. The Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 PM on 3/2/2022. A Scheduling Order will be entered. (Court Reporter: Valerie Hall-Gilliam, Alpha Reporting) (jrs) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 1/28/2021. (joj) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Wednesday, 2/10/2021 at 2:30 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. To access the telephonic conference parties will dial 888-675-2535 and enter access code 7360481. Please call at least 5 minutes in advance of the conference time. (jrs) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Status Conference is set for Wednesday, 1/20/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. To access the telephonic conference parties will dial 888-675-2535 and enter access code 7360481. Please call at least 5 minutes in advance of the conference time. (jrs) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Hamm Huseth on behalf of Buckman Laboratories, Inc. (Huseth, Emily) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Brett A. Hughes on behalf of Buckman Laboratories, Inc. (Hughes, Brett) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (agj) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (agj) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (agj) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketJudge Jon Phipps McCalla added. (agj) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (agj) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Solenis L.L.C., J. David Weatherman from Shelby County Chancery Court, case number CH-20-1537 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3522006), filed by Solenis L.L.C., J. David Weatherman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Wilbon, Clarence) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOLENIS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Buckman Laboratories, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emily Hamm Huseth

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brett A. Hughes